Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03544
Date Filed2023-11-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ana C. Reyes
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionCenter for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Interior for records concerning receipt, distribution, circulation and consideration of January 19, 2022 petition to reduce rate of oil and gas production on public lands. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-11-281COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10520625) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons for U.S. Dept. of the Interior, # 3 Summons Summons for U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons for U.S. Attorney General)(Snape, William) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/28/2023) (zrtw). (Entered: 11/28/2023)
2023-11-282LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Snape, William) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/28/2023) (zrtw). (Entered: 11/28/2023)
2023-11-283MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Marc D. Fink, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10520979. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Snape, William) (Entered: 11/28/2023)
2023-11-28Case Assigned to Judge Ana C. Reyes. (zrtw) (Entered: 11/28/2023)
2023-11-284SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 11/28/2023)
2023-12-01MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 12/1/2023. (lcsj) (Entered: 12/01/2023)
2023-12-015NOTICE of Appearance by Marc D. Fink on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Fink, Marc) (Entered: 12/01/2023)
2023-12-226RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/11/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/10/2024. (Fink, Marc) (Entered: 12/22/2023)
2023-12-227RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/11/23. (Fink, Marc) (Entered: 12/22/2023)
2023-12-228RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 12/8/2023 (Fink, Marc) (Entered: 12/22/2023)
2023-12-279NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin Kerry Eckrote on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 12/27/2023)
2023-12-2810Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 12/28/2023)
2023-12-29MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 10 consent motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint is hereby GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall have through and including February 15, 2024, to respond to the complaint in this action. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 12/29/2023. (lcsj) (Entered: 12/29/2023)
2024-01-02Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to complaint due by 2/15/2024. (zcdw) (Entered: 01/02/2024)
2024-02-1511ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 02/15/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar