Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKITLINSKI v. UNITED STATES COAST GUARD
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03550
Date Filed2023-11-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffDAREK KITLINSKI
Case DescriptionDarek Kitlinski submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Coast Guard for records containing the keywords "Kitlinski sent or receive by USCG employee Jason Wimer." The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing from the agency, Kitlinski filed an administrative appeal. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Kitlinski filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES COAST GUARD
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-11-281COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES COAST GUARD ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 206077) filed by DAREK J. KITLINSKI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) (Entered: 11/30/2023)
2023-11-28Summons (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY, and UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL. (mg) (Entered: 11/30/2023)
2023-11-282NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DAREK J. KITLINSKI. Case related to Case No. 23-cv-963. (mg) (Entered: 11/30/2023)
2023-12-063MOTION for CM/ECF Password by DAREK J. KITLINSKI. (mg) (Entered: 12/07/2023)
2023-12-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/4/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/3/2024.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/4/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES COAST GUARD served on 12/4/2023 (mg) (Entered: 12/07/2023)
2024-01-02MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 3 Motion for CM/ECF Password. Plaintiff Darek J. Kitlinski is hereby approved to access the court's electronic case management system. Plaintiff shall be responsible for monitoring his e-mail account, and, upon receipt of notice of an electronic filing, for retrieving the noticed filing. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/02/2024. (lcapm3). (Entered: 01/02/2024)
2024-01-025NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of All Defendants (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 01/02/2024)
2024-01-026MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 01/02/2024)
2024-01-027ERRATA CORRECTING MTE by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD re 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 01/02/2024)
2024-01-03MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint shall now be due on or before February 8, 2024. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/03/2024. (lcapm3) (Entered: 01/03/2024)
2024-01-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/8/2024. (smc) (Entered: 01/04/2024)
2024-02-098First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Failure to Respond to Complaint , First MOTION for Sanctions , First MOTION to Compel by DAREK KITLINSKI. (KITLINSKI, DAREK) (Entered: 02/09/2024)
2024-02-099MOTION for Leave to File by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/09/2024)
2024-02-12MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 8 Motion for Default Judgment, to Compel, and Sanctions, and granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 9 Motion for Leave to Seek Extension of Time to Respond. Defendant's missing of the deadline to file a responsive pleading does not warrant entry of default or sanctions. The motion to compel is denied as moot. Although Defendant has established excusable neglect for the missed deadline, it has not established a need for a 30-day extension. Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond by February 22, 2024. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/12/2024. (lcapm3) (Entered: 02/12/2024)
2024-02-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/22/2024. (smc) (Entered: 02/12/2024)
2024-02-2010ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/20/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar