Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03565
Date Filed2023-11-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted FOIA requests to Bureau of Land Management for records concerning various inlets. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-11-301COMPLAINT against FISH & WILDLIFE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10527777) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons for Agency, # 3 Summons Summons for AG, # 4 Summons Summons for USATTY DC)(Mercola, Monica) (Entered: 11/30/2023)
2023-11-30Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zrtw) (Entered: 11/30/2023)
2023-11-302SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 11/30/2023)
2023-11-303LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Mercola, Monica) (Entered: 11/30/2023)
2023-12-294NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/29/2023)
2024-01-085Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/08/2024)
2024-01-09MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension: Having considered the motion, and for good cause shown, the Court hereby GRANTS the motion. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the complaint in this action by March 8, 2024. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on January 9, 2024. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 01/09/2024)
2024-01-256NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Peter T. Jenkins on behalf of All Plaintiffs Substituting for attorney Monica Mercola (Jenkins, Peter) (Entered: 01/25/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar