Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHANSTEN v. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03567
Date Filed2023-11-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffPHILIP HANSTEN
Case DescriptionPhilip Hansten, a retired professor of pharmacology at the University of Washington, submitted two FOIA requests to the DEA for records concerning the issuance of Form 222s. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and took a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Hansten filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-11-301COMPLAINT against DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10528431) filed by PHILIP HANSTEN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons)(Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 11/30/2023)
2023-11-302NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by PHILIP HANSTEN. Case related to Case No. 21-2043. (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 11/30/2023)
2023-11-303LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PHILIP HANSTEN (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 11/30/2023)
2023-12-01Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zljn) (Entered: 12/01/2023)
2023-12-01NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to dcschwartz@bclplaw.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue., 2. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue., 3. For Freedom of Information Act cases you must use the FOIA Summons forms. AO 440b form is incorrect for this type of case. (zljn, ) (Entered: 12/01/2023)
2023-12-014REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Drug Enforcement Administration filed by PHILIP HANSTEN. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by PHILIP HANSTEN. (Attachments: # 1 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, # 2 Summons to U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 12/01/2023)
2023-12-045SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 12/04/2023)
2024-02-216RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/15/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/16/2024. (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 02/21/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar