Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRichardson v. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictDistrict of Nevada
CityLas Vegas
Case Number2:2023cv01939
Date Filed2023-11-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Gloria M. Navarro
PlaintiffWilliam Richardson
Case DescriptionWilliam Richardson submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Richardson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Patrol
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [16]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-11-211COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7502018) by William A. Richardson. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/1/2023. Proof of service due by 2/19/2024. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney Dist. of Nevada, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons Border Protection, # 5 Summons Homeland Security) (Chesnoff, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/21/2023)
2023-11-212NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Brett O'Brien to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov . Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/5/2023. (no image attached) (WJ) (Entered: 11/21/2023)
2023-11-213MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Brett O'Brien and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David Chesnoff (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7502121) by Plaintiff William A. Richardson. (Chesnoff, David) (Entered: 11/21/2023)
2023-11-21Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (RGDG) (Entered: 11/21/2023)
2023-11-214AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by William Richardson. No changes to parties. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibits A-D) (Chesnoff, David) (Entered: 11/21/2023)
2023-11-215SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Customs and Border Patrol, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re 1 Complaint. (RGDG) (Entered: 11/21/2023)
2023-11-216CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by William Richardson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Chesnoff, David) (Entered: 11/21/2023)
2023-11-227ERRATA to 3 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiff William Richardson.. (Chesnoff, David) (Entered: 11/22/2023)
2023-11-228MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/22/2023. Pending before the Court is the 3 Petition to Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by Petitioner Brett O'Brien. Petitioner also submitted the 7 Errata to the 3 Petition. Under this Court's Local Rules, a verified petition to practice in a particular case must include "an attached certification issued within six months before the date of filing of the verified petition that the applicant's membership is in good standing from the state bar or from the clerk of the supreme court or highest admitting court of every state... in which the applicant has been admitted to practice law." LR 11-1(b)(3). The 7 Errata notes that Petitioner was admitted to the Supreme Courts of Ohio, New York, and New Jersey, as well as the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, and lists bar numbers for each jurisdiction. ( See Errata at 23, ECF No. 7). But the 3 Petition and 7 Errata both include a Certificate of Good Standing from Ohio only. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court DEFERS ruling on the 3 Petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner shall have until December 13, 2023, to file a corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event that includes all applicable Certificates of Good Standing. Failure to timely remedy the deficiencies WILL result in the denial of the Verified Petition and Petitioner's requirement to repay the filing fee. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CMD) (Entered: 11/22/2023)
2023-11-259STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink www.nvd.uscourts.gov . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV) (Entered: 11/25/2023)
2023-12-1310AFFIDAVIT of Proof of Service re 5 Summons Issued as to USA by Plaintiff William Richardson.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Chesnoff, David) (Entered: 12/13/2023)
2023-12-1311NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 3 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Brett O'Brien, by Plaintiff William Richardson. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Chesnoff, David) (Entered: 12/13/2023)
2023-12-1512MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/15/2023. Per the Court's instruction in Minute Order No. 8 , Petitioner Brett O'Brien filed the 11 Notice of Corrected Image/Document re 3 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice. Although Petitioner included all certificates of good standing, Petitioner did not complete the form. Namely, Petitioner did not include the date or list all courts and bar numbers on page 2. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court again DEFERS ruling on the 3 Petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner shall have until January 5, 2024, to file a corrected and fully filled out Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document." Failure to timely remedy the deficiencies WILL result in the denial of the Verified Petition and Petitioner's requirement to repay the filing fee. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CMD) (Entered: 12/15/2023)
2023-12-1813NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 3 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, 7 Errata for attorney Brett O'Brien, by Plaintiff William Richardson. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Chesnoff, David) (Entered: 12/18/2023)
2023-12-1915ORDER Granting 3 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brett J. O'Brien for William Richardson and approving Designation of Local Counsel Attorney David Z. Chesnoff. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/19/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website www.pacer.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG) (Entered: 12/20/2023)
2023-12-2014STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading re 4 Amended Complaint by Defendants Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Customs and Border Patrol. (Pearson, Skyler) (extend) (answer) (Entered: 12/20/2023)
2023-12-2116ORDER granting ECF No. 14 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Response/answer re ECF No. 1 is due by January 5, 2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/21/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) (Entered: 12/21/2023)
2023-12-2817SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Richardson re 1 Complaint,,. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 12/28/2023)
2024-01-0518ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint filed by All Defendants. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/15/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/19/2024.(Pearson, Skyler) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/05/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar