Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleChenennou v. Jaddou et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2023cv06452
Date Filed2023-12-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jon S. Tigar
PlaintiffNouria Chenennou
Case DescriptionNouria Chenennou submitted two FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning her immigration files. The agency acknowledged the requests but told Chenennou that it had no responsive records. Chenennou then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUr M. Jaddou Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantAlejandro Mayorkas Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-12-141COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-18940556.). Filed by NOURIA CHENENNOU. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Georgousopoulos, Stefanos) (Filed on 12/14/2023) (Entered: 12/14/2023)
2023-12-142Case assigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2023) (Entered: 12/14/2023)
2023-12-143Proposed Summons. (Georgousopoulos, Stefanos) (Filed on 12/14/2023) (Entered: 12/14/2023)
2023-12-154Summons Issued as to Ur M. Jaddou(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2023) (Entered: 12/15/2023)
2023-12-155Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2023) (Entered: 12/15/2023)
2024-02-136NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Second Cause of Action without Prejudice by Nouria Chenennou (Georgousopoulos, Stefanos) (Filed on 2/13/2024) (Entered: 02/13/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar