Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCarranza et al v. Mayorkas et al
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2023cv16852
Date Filed2023-12-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Steven C. Seeger
PlaintiffYolanda Carranza
PlaintiffManuel Carranza
Case DescriptionYolanda and Manuel Carranza submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and the Department of State for records concerning the I-130 petition submitted to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services so that Manuel could become a U.S. citizen based on Yolanda's U.S. citizenship. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, the Carranzas filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantAledandro Mayorkas
DefendantAledandro Mayorkas Secretary of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUr M Jaddou Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantDIRECTOR OF USCIS UR M JADDOU
DefendantSecretary of State Antony J. Blinken
DefendantAntony J. Blinken Secretary of State, U.S. Department of State
DefendantRena Bitter
DefendantRena Bitter Assistant Secretary for the Bureau of Consular Affairs, U.S. Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-12-151COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Under the Freedom of Information Act and for Writ of Mandamus filed by Yolanda Carranza, Manuel Carranza; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21430543. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elmore, Christopher) (Entered: 12/15/2023)
2023-12-152ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Manuel Carranza, Yolanda Carranza by Christopher Paul Elmore (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elmore, Christopher) (Entered: 12/15/2023)
2023-12-18CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Keri L. Holleb Hotaling. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (gmm, ) (Entered: 12/18/2023)
2023-12-18CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached Consent To form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (gmm, ) (Entered: 12/18/2023)
2023-12-193MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by March 4, 2024. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 12/19/2023)
2023-12-19SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (emc, ) (Entered: 12/19/2023)
2023-12-284ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates) , any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this LINK will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, ) (Entered: 12/28/2023)
2024-01-025SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yolanda Carranza, Manuel Carranza as to All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summons Atty General, # 2 Exhibit Summons AUSA, # 3 Exhibit Summons DHS Jaddou, # 4 Exhibit Summons DOS Blinken, # 5 Exhibit Certified mail receipts and delivery confirmation, # 6 Exhibit Summons DOS Bitter)(Elmore, Christopher) (Entered: 01/02/2024)
2024-01-026CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiffs Manuel Carranza, Yolanda Carranza regarding text entry,,,,,, 3 (Elmore, Christopher) (Entered: 01/02/2024)
2024-01-037re-filing of Dkt. 5-5 due to corrupt pdf by Manuel Carranza, Yolanda Carranza (Elmore, Christopher) (Entered: 01/03/2024)
2024-01-238DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Rena Bitter, Antony J. Blinken, Ur M Jaddou, Aledandro Mayorkas (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 01/23/2024)
2024-01-239DESIGNATION of Joshua Samuel Press as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Rena Bitter, Antony J. Blinken, Ur M Jaddou, Aledandro Mayorkas (Press, Joshua) (Entered: 01/23/2024)
2024-01-2910MOTION by Defendants Rena Bitter, Antony J. Blinken, Ur M Jaddou, Aledandro Mayorkas for extension of time (Agreed). (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 01/29/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar