Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleREY SOTO v. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03753
Date Filed2023-12-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffCARLOS ARTURO REY SOTO
Case DescriptionCarlos Arturo Rey Soto submitted a FOIA request to the DEA for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Rey Soto filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-12-181COMPLAINT against DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10566955) filed by CARLOS ARTURO REY SOTO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons DEA, # 4 Summons Summons AG, # 5 Summons Summons AUSa)(White, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/18/2023)
2023-12-18Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zrtw) (Entered: 12/18/2023)
2023-12-182SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 12/18/2023)
2023-12-243STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 24, 2023. (lcbah4) (Entered: 12/24/2023)
2024-01-054NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/05/2024)
2024-01-205MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond (with partial consent) by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/20/2024)
2024-01-23MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING, over plaintiff's partial objection, defendant's 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, and DIRECTING defendant to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by February 23, 2024. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 23, 2024. (lcbah4) (Entered: 01/23/2024)
2024-01-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response To The Plaintiff's Complaint due by 2/23/2024. (mac) (Entered: 01/23/2024)
2024-02-236ANSWER to Complaint by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION.(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/23/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar