Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleORNSTEIN-SCHULER INVESTMENTS LLC v. U.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03761
Date Filed2023-12-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffORNSTEIN-SCHULER INVESTMENTS LLC
Case DescriptionOrnstein-Schuler Investments submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning the agency's valuation of property assets in public court cases. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told OSI that much of the information belonged to third parties and could be disclosed without authorization. After hearing nothing further from the agency, OSI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-12-181COMPLAINT against U.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10567612) filed by ORNSTEIN-SCHULER INVESTMENTS LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons IRS, # 4 Summons DOJ, # 5 Summons USAO)(Rosenstein, Rod) (Entered: 12/18/2023)
2023-12-182LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ORNSTEIN-SCHULER INVESTMENTS LLC (Rosenstein, Rod) (Entered: 12/18/2023)
2023-12-19Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsl) (Entered: 12/19/2023)
2023-12-193SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 12/19/2023)
2024-01-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 1/5/2024 (Rosenstein, Rod) (Entered: 01/16/2024)
2024-01-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/10/2024. (Rosenstein, Rod) (Entered: 01/16/2024)
2024-01-166RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/5/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/4/2024. (Rosenstein, Rod) (Entered: 01/16/2024)
2024-02-057ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 02/05/2024)
2024-02-068ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before February 20, 2024. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/6/24. (lcapm2) (Entered: 02/06/2024)
2024-02-209Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 02/20/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar