Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLouisiana v. U S Environmental Protection Agency
DistrictWestern District of Louisiana
CityLake Charles
Case Number2:2023cv01774
Date Filed2023-12-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James D Cain, Jr
PlaintiffState of Louisiana by & through its Attorney General, Jeff Landry
Case DescriptionThe State of Louisiana submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning environmental justice in Louisiana. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told the State of Louisiana that the request was too broad to conduct adequate search. Louisiana narrowed the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Louisiana filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU S Environmental Protection Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-12-191COMPLAINT against U S Environmental Protection Agency (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5798790) filed by State of Louisiana. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-EPA-2023-005099 Initial Response Letter- St. John, # 2 Exhibit 2-Email Re_ Freedom of Information Act Request No. EPA-2023-005099, # 3 Exhibit 3-EPA-2023-005099 Fee Waiver Denial Letter, # 4 Exhibit 4-2023.08.04 St. John to EPA re FOIA Response, # 5 Exhibit 5-EPA-2023-005099 Clarification Letter St. John 08252023, # 6 Exhibit 6-Email Correspondence re FOIA, # 7 Exhibit 7-EPA-2023-005099 Follow-Up and Proposed Clarification, # 8 Exhibit 8-Interim Release Letter EPA-2023-005099, # 9 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Louisiana(pty:pla))(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/19/2023)
2023-12-192NOTICE of Related Case by State of Louisiana (Attorney Joseph Scott St John added to party State of Louisiana(pty:pla)) (aty,St John, Joseph) (Entered: 12/19/2023)
2023-12-19CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 12/20/2023)
2023-12-203SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, U S Environmental Protection Agency. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 12/20/2023)
2024-01-094ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/9/2024. (crt,Kiper, C) (Entered: 01/09/2024)
2024-01-195SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Louisiana U S Environmental Protection Agency served on 12/26/2023, answer due 2/26/2024. (aty,St John, Joseph) (Entered: 01/19/2024)
2024-01-256ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by U S Environmental Protection Agency.(Attorney Shannon Thornhill Brown added to party U S Environmental Protection Agency(pty:dft))(aty,Brown, Shannon) (Entered: 01/25/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar