Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOSARIO v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03779
Date Filed2023-12-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffLIANET ALVAREZ OSARIO
Case DescriptionLianet Alvarez Osario submitted a FOIA request U.S, Customs and Border Protection for records concerning the death of her mother while crossing the southern border. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Osario filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-12-201COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10573341) filed by Lianet Alvarez Osario. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fels, Andrew) (Entered: 12/20/2023)
2023-12-202REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by Lianet Alvarez Osario. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Lianet Alvarez Osario.(Fels, Andrew) (Entered: 12/20/2023)
2023-12-21Case Assigned to Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsl) (Entered: 12/21/2023)
2023-12-223SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 12/22/2023)
2024-01-294RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/17/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/16/2024. (Fels, Andrew) (Entered: 01/29/2024)
2024-01-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/22/2024. (Fels, Andrew) (Entered: 01/29/2024)
2024-01-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 1/12/2024 (Fels, Andrew) (Entered: 01/29/2024)
2024-02-067AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION filed by LIANET ALVAREZ OSARIO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Fels, Andrew) (Entered: 02/06/2024)
2024-02-158Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bardo, John) (Entered: 02/15/2024)
2024-02-15MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) The Consent 8 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; and 2) Defendant shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by March 1, 2024. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/15/2024. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 02/15/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar