Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHERITAGE FOUNDATION et al v. U.S. CONSUMER PRODUCT SAFETY COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03783
Date Filed2023-12-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffHERITAGE FOUNDATION
PlaintiffMIKE HOWELL
Case DescriptionHeritage Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Consumer Product Safety Commission for records concerning the agency's work regarding natural gas stoves. Heritage Foundation also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency granted the Heritage Foundation's request for expedited processing. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Heritage Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CONSUMER PRODUCT SAFETY COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-12-201COMPLAINT against HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10574563) filed by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6)(Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 12/20/2023)
2023-12-21Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zrtw) (Entered: 12/21/2023)
2023-12-212SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CONSUMER PRODUCT SAFETY COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 12/21/2023)
2024-01-223NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of All Defendants (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 01/22/2024)
2024-01-224ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CONSUMER PRODUCT SAFETY COMMISSION.(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 01/22/2024)
2024-02-085GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 8, 2024. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 02/08/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar