Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHairston v. Social Security Administration et al
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2023cv03455
Date Filed2023-12-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Stephanie A. Gallagher
PlaintiffArthur Hairston
Case DescriptionArthur Hairston submitted a FOIA request to the Social Security Administration for records concerning a complaint he filed with the agency. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Hairston filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantSocial Security Administration
DefendantMs. Martin
DefendantMelissa Feldhan
DefendantAndrew Saul Secretary SSA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-12-201COMPLAINT against Melissa Feldhan, Martin, Andrew Saul, Social Security Administration, filed by Arthur Hairston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 USPS tracking information, # 4 Envelope)(dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/nef staff attys) (Entered: 12/21/2023)
2023-12-202MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Arthur Hairston. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/21/2023)
2023-12-213New Case Notification Letter sent to Arthur Hairston. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 12/21/23) (Entered: 12/21/2023)
2024-01-024ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting Plaintiff time to complete and return U.S. Marshal forms and Summons forms; directing clerk to issue upon receipt and forward to U.S. Marshal to effectuate service as directed. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/2/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m w/forms as directed 1/2/24) (Entered: 01/02/2024)
2024-01-085MOTION to Submit Documents for the Courts Review by Arthur Hairston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 labeled as a second Exhibit 9, # 11 Envelope)(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/08/2024)
2024-01-176Summons Issued 60 days as to Melissa Feldhan, Martin, Andrew Saul, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 USMS 285 forms, # 2 Cover Letter, # 3 Envelope)(dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/em usms 1/17/24) (Entered: 01/17/2024)
2024-01-317SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur Hairston. (U.S.Attorney Served 1/22/24, answer due 3/22/2024) Melissa Feldhan served on 1/23/24, answer due 3/22/2024; Martin served on 1/23/24, answer due 3/22/2024; Andrew Saul served on 1/23/2024, answer due 3/22/2024; Social Security Administration served on 1/22/2024, answer due 3/22/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/31/2024)
2024-02-058AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on U.S. Attorney General on 1/25/24, filed by Arthur Hairston. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/05/2024)
2024-02-219MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by Melissa Feldhan, Martin, Andrew Saul, Social Security Administration (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order, # 8 Envelope to Plaintiff)(Micco, Megan) (Entered: 02/21/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar