Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDAILY WIRE, LLC v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03799
Date Filed2023-12-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffDAILY WIRE, LLC
Case DescriptionThe Daily Wire submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Justice's Community Relations Service for records. The first request sought Hannah Levine's emails. Daily Wire also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The second request asked for records that reflected the scale of CRS's activities. Daily Wire asked for a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Daily Wire filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantTHE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-12-211COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10577380) filed by DAILY WIRE, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Meckler, Jacob) (Entered: 12/21/2023)
2023-12-22Case Assigned to Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (zljn) (Entered: 12/22/2023)
2023-12-222SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 12/22/2023)
2024-01-093NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 01/09/2024)
2024-01-254Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 01/25/2024)
2024-01-26MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant's 4 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; and 2) Defendant shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by March 1, 2024. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/26/2024. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/26/2024)
2024-01-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/1/2024 (lsj) (Entered: 01/26/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar