Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLain v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security
DistrictSouthern District of Texas
CityGalveston
Case Number3:2023cv00404
Date Filed2023-12-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jeffrey V Brown
PlaintiffKim Lain
Case DescriptionKim Lain submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the agency's knowledge of the use of wristbands by human traffickers. The request also asked for expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Lain filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Fees, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-12-211COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-30968885) filed by Kim Lain. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8 Part. 1, # 10 Exhibit 8 Part. 2, # 11 Exhibit 8 Part. 3, # 12 Exhibit 8 Part. 4, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11)(Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 12/21/2023)
2023-12-212Request for Issuance of Summons as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, filed.(Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 12/21/2023)
2023-12-223ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/3/2024 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(VanesaAranda, 3) (Entered: 12/22/2023)
2023-12-22Summons Not Issued as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security due to these deficiencies: Party named on summons is not a named defendant on the case. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed. (VanesaAranda, 3) (Entered: 12/22/2023)
2023-12-224Request for Issuance of Summons as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, filed.(Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 12/22/2023)
2023-12-225Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(AndyGould, 3) (Entered: 12/22/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar