Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENVIRONMENTAL WORKING GROUP v. FOOD SAFETY AND INSPECTION SERVICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03806
Date Filed2023-12-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffENVIRONMENTAL WORKING GROUP
Case DescriptionEnvironmental Working Group submitted a FOIA request to the Food Safety and Inspection Service for records concerning communications between the agency and Tyson Foods pertaining to claims made about its Brazen Beef brand. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency withheld records under Exemption 4 (commercial and confidential). EWG filed an administrative appeal of the denial. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EWG filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFOOD SAFETY AND INSPECTION SERVICE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-12-221COMPLAINT against FOOD SAFETY AND INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10577895) filed by ENVIRONMENTAL WORKING GROUP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B FSIS Final Response, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C Records, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D FOIA Appeal, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E FOIA Appeal Acknowledgment, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons Summons - Att'y General, # 8 Summons Summons -DIst. Att'y, # 9 Summons Summons - FSIS, # 10 Summons Summons - USDA)(Apfel, Carrie) (Entered: 12/22/2023)
2023-12-222ENTERED IN ERROR.....LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ENVIRONMENTAL WORKING GROUP (Apfel, Carrie) Modified on 12/26/2023 (zsl). (Entered: 12/22/2023)
2023-12-26NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint, 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE; emailed to capfel@earthjustice.org, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsl, ) (Entered: 12/26/2023)
2023-12-263CIVIL COVER SHEET by ENVIRONMENTAL WORKING GROUP filed by ENVIRONMENTAL WORKING GROUP.(Apfel, Carrie) (Entered: 12/26/2023)
2023-12-264LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ENVIRONMENTAL WORKING GROUP (Apfel, Carrie) (Entered: 12/26/2023)
2023-12-265MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeffrey Stein, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10581891. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ENVIRONMENTAL WORKING GROUP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Apfel, Carrie) (Entered: 12/26/2023)
2023-12-26Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsl) (Entered: 12/26/2023)
2023-12-26NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeffrey Stein, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10581891. Fee Status: Fee Paid. The following error(s) need correction: Declaration must have an original, ink signature. Please refile using the event Declaration. (mg) (Entered: 12/26/2023)
2024-01-106DECLARATION by ENVIRONMENTAL WORKING GROUP re 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeffrey Stein, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10581891. Fee Status: Fee Paid.. (Apfel, Carrie) (Entered: 01/10/2024)
2024-02-13MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jeffrey Stein is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/13/2024. (lcapm3) (Entered: 02/13/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar