Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSYRIA JUSTICE AND ACCOUNTABILITY CENTRE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03808
Date Filed2023-12-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffSYRIA JUSTICE AND ACCOUNTABILITY CENTRE
Case DescriptionSyria Justice and Accountability Centre filed FOIA requests to the Department of Defense and the Department of State for records concerning the identities of any person detained, killed, or released by ISIL, a Syrian terrorist organization. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, SJAC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-12-221COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10578872) filed by SYRIA JUSTICE AND ACCOUNTABILITY CENTRE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/22/2023)
2023-12-26Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zljn) (Entered: 12/26/2023)
2023-12-262SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 12/26/2023)
2024-01-253ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 01/25/2024)
2024-01-25MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed briefing schedule (not 16.3 report) on or before February 8, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 01/25/2024. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/25/2024)
2024-02-014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 1/24/2024 (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/01/2024)
2024-02-015RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 1/24/2024 (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/01/2024)
2024-02-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/25/2024. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/01/2024)
2024-02-017RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/25/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/24/2024. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/01/2024)
2024-02-088Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 02/08/2024)
2024-02-09MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before March 8, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/09/2024. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/09/2024)
2024-02-229ERRATA by SYRIA JUSTICE AND ACCOUNTABILITY CENTRE re 1 Complaint,. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/22/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar