Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCALDWELL v. MAYORKAS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03809
Date Filed2023-12-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffTHOMAS A. CALDWELL
Case DescriptionThomas Caldwell submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning his late wife's employment. His wife committed suicide in December 2022 after complaining to family that her employment was causing her depression, particularly bullying and harassment by two co-workers. Caldwell filed two FOIA requests with DHS but after hearing nothing further, he filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantALEJANDRO MAYORKAS The Honorable, Secretary of Homeland Security
DefendantALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS The Honorable, Secretary of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-12-221COMPLAINT against ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10579356) filed by THOMAS A. CALDWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Secretary of Homeland Security, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons US Attorney for D.C.)(Thompson, Carol) (Entered: 12/22/2023)
2023-12-26Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsl) (Entered: 12/26/2023)
2023-12-272SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 12/27/2023)
2024-02-023RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/11/2024. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/10/2024.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/18/2024., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS served on 1/17/2024 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service - Sec. of Homeland Security, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service - Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit Proof of Service - US Attorney for DC)(Thompson, Carol) (Entered: 02/02/2024)
2024-02-064NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Levy on behalf of ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS (Levy, Brian) (Entered: 02/06/2024)
2024-02-065Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 02/06/2024)
2024-02-07MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by March 4, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/7/2024. (lccrc2) (Entered: 02/07/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar