Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03836
Date Filed2023-12-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Loren L. AliKhan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records concerning communications with Kathy Chung, Deputy Director of Protocol, concerning the Penn Biden Center. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-12-281COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10584964) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Defense Department, # 3 Summons US Atty for DC, # 4 Summons US Atty General)(Francescon, Patrick) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/28/2023) (zrtw). (Entered: 12/28/2023)
2023-12-282LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Francescon, Patrick) (Entered: 12/28/2023)
2023-12-29Case Assigned to Judge Loren L. AliKhan. (zsl) (Entered: 12/29/2023)
2024-01-023SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zdp) (Entered: 01/02/2024)
2024-01-234RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/3/2024. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/2/2024.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/9/2024., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 1/8/2024 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Francescon, Patrick) (Entered: 01/23/2024)
2024-02-025ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 02/02/2024)
2024-02-026ORDER: The court hereby ORDERS the parties to meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before March 1, 2024. See order for details. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 02/02/2024. (lclla2) (Entered: 02/02/2024)
2024-02-02Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/1/2024. (zcdw) (Entered: 02/02/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar