Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHOLLAND LAW FIRM et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03907
Date Filed2023-12-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffHOLLAND LAW FIRM
PlaintiffLANIER LAW FIRM
Case DescriptionThe Holland Law Firm and the Lanier Law Firm submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning current and projected staffing for the Benefits & Recovery Center. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the law firms filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantCENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-12-291COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10587205) filed by HOLLAND LAW FIRM, LANIER LAW FRM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Freedom of Information Act Request dated July 20, 2023, # 2 Exhibit B - CMS Response dated July 28, 2023, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons - U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, # 5 Summons - Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services)(Munn, Charles) (Entered: 12/29/2023)
2023-12-292LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HOLLAND LAW FIRM, LANIER LAW FRM (Munn, Charles) (Entered: 12/29/2023)
2023-12-293NOTICE of Appearance by James Woodside Orth, I on behalf of HOLLAND LAW FIRM, LANIER LAW FRM (Orth, James) (Entered: 12/29/2023)
2023-12-294MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rebecca MacDowell Lecaroz, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10587587. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HOLLAND LAW FIRM, LANIER LAW FRM. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rebecca MacDowell Lecaroz, # 2 Exhibit A - certificate of good standing)(Munn, Charles) (Entered: 12/29/2023)
2023-12-295MOTION to Expedite Motion to Set Expedited Scheduling Order by HOLLAND LAW FIRM, LANIER LAW FRM. (Munn, Charles) (Entered: 12/29/2023)
2024-01-03NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to cmunn@brownrudnick.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsl, ) (Entered: 01/03/2024)
2024-01-036ERRATA Corrected Complaint to comply with LCvR 5.1(c) by HOLLAND LAW FIRM, LANIER LAW FIRM re 1 Complaint,,. (Munn, Charles) (Entered: 01/03/2024)
2024-01-04Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zljn) (Entered: 01/04/2024)
2024-01-047SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (zljn) (Entered: 01/04/2024)
2024-01-04NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to cmunn@brownrudnick.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (zljn, ) (Entered: 01/04/2024)
2024-01-048REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Attorney General of the United States and US Attorney's Office filed by HOLLAND LAW FIRM, LANIER LAW FIRM.(Munn, Charles) (Entered: 01/04/2024)
2024-01-059SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 01/05/2024)
2024-01-08MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on January 8, 2024. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 01/08/2024)
2024-01-1810NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Lecaroz on behalf of HOLLAND LAW FIRM, LANIER LAW FIRM (Lecaroz, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/18/2024)
2024-01-2411RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General January 8, 2024. (Munn, Charles) (Entered: 01/24/2024)
2024-01-2412RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/8/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/7/2024. (Munn, Charles) (Entered: 01/24/2024)
2024-01-2413RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES served on 1/11/2024 (Munn, Charles) (Entered: 01/24/2024)
2024-01-2414RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 1/10/2024 (Munn, Charles) (Entered: 01/24/2024)
2024-02-0515NOTICE of Appearance by Tabitha Bartholomew on behalf of All Defendants (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 02/05/2024)
2024-02-0516Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 02/05/2024)
2024-02-06MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: In light of the consent motion, and finding good cause, the motion is GRANTED. Defendants' Answer is due March 8, 2024. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on February 6, 2024. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 02/06/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar