Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSharpe v. United States Naval Academy
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2023cv03532
Date Filed2023-12-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge James K. Bredar
PlaintiffCDR John F. Sharpe United States Navy (Retired)
Case DescriptionJohn Sharpe, a retired Navy officer now working as a paralegal, submitted five FOIA requests to the U.S. Naval Academy for records on behalf of midshipmen at the Naval Academy facing adverse honor and conduct proceedings. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency provided responsive records but the law firm filed an administrative appeal claiming the search was inadequate. Sharpe ultimately filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantUnited States Naval Academy
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-12-291COMPLAINT against United States Naval Academy ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11008102.), filed by John F. Sharpe. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USNA, # 3 Summons Barron, # 4 Summons Garland)(McFadden, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/29/2023)
2023-12-292Summons Issued 30 days as to United States Naval Academy, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ols, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 1/4/2024 (ols, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 12/29/2023)
2024-01-123SUMMONS Returned Executed by John F. Sharpe. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McFadden, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/12/2024)
2024-01-124SUMMONS Returned Executed by John F. Sharpe. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McFadden, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/12/2024)
2024-02-065SUMMONS Returned Executed by John F. Sharpe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McFadden, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/06/2024)
2024-02-076MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States Naval Academy (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit Campbell Declaration)(Farber, Molissa) (Entered: 02/07/2024)
2024-02-207Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by John F. Sharpe.(McFadden, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/20/2024)
2024-02-208MARGINAL ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 2/20/2024. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/20/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar