Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2024-01-17 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18508107.), filed by Estate of Ashli Babbitt, Aaron Babbitt. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:24-cv-119-LL-JLB. Judge Linda Lopez and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Robert Patrick Sticht)(rxc) (sjt). (Entered: 01/18/2024) |
2024-01-18 | 2 | Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (rxc) (sjt). (Entered: 01/18/2024) |
2024-02-08 | 3 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of Ashli Babbitt, Aaron Babbitt. U.S. Department of Justice served. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Sticht, Robert) (ddf). (Entered: 02/08/2024) |
2024-02-26 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Drew Silverberg on behalf of U.S. Department of Justice (Silverberg, Cameron)Attorney Cameron Drew Silverberg added to party U.S. Department of Justice(pty:dft) (ddf). (Entered: 02/26/2024) |
2024-02-28 | 5 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by U.S. Department of Justice.(Silverberg, Cameron) (ddf). (Entered: 02/28/2024) |
2024-03-07 | 6 | NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation And Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 3/7/2024.(ddf) (Entered: 03/07/2024) |
2024-03-25 | 7 | Joint MOTION to Vacate Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference, Joint Discovery Plan, and Proposed Schedule by U.S. Department of Justice. (Silverberg, Cameron) (ddf). (Entered: 03/25/2024) |
2024-03-26 | 8 | ORDER Granting Joint Motion To Vacate Early Neutral Evaluation And Case Management Conference, Joint Discovery Plan, And Proposed Schedule, And Requiring Filing Of Joint Status Reports [ECF No. 7 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 3/26/2024. (ddf) (Entered: 03/26/2024) |
2024-09-30 | 9 | MOTION for Modification of Processing Schedule and Joint Status Report by U.S. Department of Justice. (Silverberg, Cameron) (ddf). (Entered: 09/30/2024) |
2024-10-03 | 10 | ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion For Modification Of Processing Schedule [ECF No. 9 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 10/3/2024. (ddf) (Entered: 10/03/2024) |
2024-11-29 | 11 | JOINT STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by U.S. Department of Justice. (Silverberg, Cameron) (bdc). (Entered: 11/29/2024) |
2025-01-28 | 12 | STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by U.S. Department of Justice. (Silverberg, Cameron) (bdc). (Entered: 01/28/2025) |
2025-02-25 | 13 | Joint MOTION for Modification of Processing Schedule by U.S. Department of Justice. (Silverberg, Cameron) (bdc). (Entered: 02/25/2025) |
2025-02-26 | 14 | MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Good cause appearing, the parties' 13 Joint MOTION for Modification of Processing Schedule is GRANTED. Accordingly, the processing schedule (see ECF Nos. 8 , 10 ) is modified as follows: Defendant's next production response is due no later than 4/30/2025 , with monthly rolling production responses to resume thereafter. The parties shall file their next Joint Status Report no later than 5/16/2025 . (no document attached) (cxe) (Entered: 02/26/2025) |
Hide Docket Events |