Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2024cv00224
Date Filed2024-01-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK
Case DescriptionNational Student Legal Defense Network submitted five FOIA requests to the Department of Education for records concerning a variety of issues. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, NSLDN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2024-01-251COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10643884) filed by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Rothschild, Eric) Modified on 1/25/2024 to correct docket text (rj). (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/26/2024) (zrtw). (Entered: 01/25/2024)
2024-01-252LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK (Rothschild, Eric) (Entered: 01/25/2024)
2024-01-26Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zrtw) (Entered: 01/26/2024)
2024-01-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 01/26/2024)
2024-02-054RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/1/24., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/1/2024. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/2/2024.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 1/31/2024 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Rothschild, Eric) (Entered: 02/05/2024)
2024-02-225NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 02/22/2024)
2024-03-046ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION.(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 03/04/2024)
2024-03-05MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by March 25, 2024. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/5/2024. (lctjk1) (Entered: 03/05/2024)
2024-03-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 3/25/2024. (zkh) (Entered: 03/05/2024)
2024-03-257Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK. (Rothschild, Eric) (Entered: 03/25/2024)
2024-03-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by May 24, 2024. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/27/2024. (lctjk1) (Entered: 03/27/2024)
2024-05-248Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 05/24/2024)
2024-05-28MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by August 22, 2024, and every 90 days thereafter until the Court orders otherwise. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/28/2024. (lctjk1) (Entered: 05/28/2024)
2024-08-229Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/22/2024)
2024-08-26MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by October 21, 2024, and every 60 days thereafter until the Court orders otherwise. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/26/2024. (lctjk1) (Entered: 08/26/2024)
2024-10-2110Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 10/21/2024)
2024-10-2211NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Scott Ritchie on behalf of NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ritchie, Tyler) Modified docket text on 10/22/2024 (zdp). (Entered: 10/22/2024)
2024-12-2012Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK. (Rothschild, Eric) (Entered: 12/20/2024)
2024-12-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by February 18, 2025. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/21/2024. (lctjk1) (Entered: 12/21/2024)
2025-02-1813Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 02/18/2025)
2025-02-20MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by April 21, 2025. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/20/2025. (lctjk1) (Entered: 02/20/2025)
2025-04-2114Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 04/21/2025)
2025-04-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by May 23, 2025, updating the Court on the status of Defendant's consultation with the White House and the release of responsive records to Plaintiff as well as Plaintiff's position on narrowing the scope of its FOIA request, 23-02326-F. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/22/2025. (lctjk1) (Entered: 04/22/2025)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar