Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThompson v. Holder et al
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2010cv00578
Date Filed2010-03-01
Date Closed2012-01-20
JudgeJudge J. Owen Forrester
PlaintiffLila C. Thompson
DefendantEric Holder United States Department of Justice
DefendantEric Holder United States Department of Justice
TERMINATED: 01/07/2011
DefendantFederal Bureau of Prisons
DefendantEd Nash
DefendantEd Nash
TERMINATED: 01/07/2011
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-03-011COMPLAINT, filed by Lila C. Thompson. Consent form to proceed before U.S. Magistrate and pretrial instructions provided. ( Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 21741.) (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/02/2010)
2010-03-032Summons Issued as to Eric Holder, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (bse) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
2010-03-033WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lila C. Thompson. Eric Holder waiver mailed on 3/3/2010, answer due 5/3/2010. (bse) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
2010-03-034WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lila C. Thompson. Ed Nash waiver mailed on 3/3/2010, answer due 5/3/2010. (bse) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
2010-03-035CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lila C. Thompson.(bse) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
2010-03-096DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lila C. Thompson. (Ladson, Nancy) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
2010-03-197REVISED CASE INSTRUCTIONS. (bse) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
2010-05-038MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Or Answer with Brief In Support by Eric Holder, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Ed Nash. (Ben-David, Neeli) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
2010-05-109RESPONSE re 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Or Answer filed by Lila C. Thompson. (Ladson, Nancy) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
2010-05-1710MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Eric Holder, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Ed Nash. (Ben-David, Neeli) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
2010-05-24Submission of 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Or Answer, submitted to District Judge J. Owen Forrester. (bse) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
2010-05-2811RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lila C. Thompson. (Sykes, Tamika) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
2010-06-10Submission of 10 MOTION to Dismiss, submitted to District Judge J. Owen Forrester. (bse) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
2010-06-1412REPLY BRIEF re 10 MOTION to Dismiss In Support filed by Eric Holder, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Ed Nash. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Ben-David, Neeli) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
2011-01-0713OPINION and ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time; granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss. The only remaining claims are Plaintiff's claims pursuant to the federal Privacy Act against Defendant Federal Bureau of Prisions. Signed by Judge J. Owen Forrester on 1/7/11. (bse) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
2011-01-2814ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT by Federal Bureau of Prisons. Discovery ends on 6/27/2011.(Ben-David, Neeli) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/28/2011)
2011-05-2615CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Federal Bureau of Prisons.(Ben-David, Neeli) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
2011-06-0216NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lila C. Thompson filed by Federal Bureau of Prisons (Ben-David, Neeli) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
2011-06-0217CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Discovery by Lila C. Thompson.(Sykes, Tamika) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
2011-06-0318CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for discovery by Lila C. Thompson.(Sykes, Tamika) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
2011-06-2719CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Discovery Request by Lila C. Thompson.(Sykes, Tamika) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
2011-07-2620MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motion with Brief In Support by Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Ben-David, Neeli) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
2011-08-0821RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motion filed by Lila C. Thompson. (Sykes, Tamika) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
2011-08-1622REPLY BRIEF re 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motion filed by Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ben-David, Neeli) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
2011-08-24Submission of 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motion, submitted to District Judge J. Owen Forrester. (bse) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
2011-08-2623NOTICE Of Filing Original Deposition Transcript of Lila C. Thompson by Federal Bureau of Prisons (Ben-David, Neeli) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
2011-08-2624MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Thompson Deposition excerpts), # 2 Exhibit B (Nash Declaration), # 3 Exhibit C (Statement of Facts), # 4 Exhibit D (Humphrey Declaration), # 5 Exhibit E (Branch Declaration))(Ben-David, Neeli) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- (Entered: 08/26/2011)
2011-08-2625MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Medical Records Under Seal with Brief In Support by Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Ben-David, Neeli) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
2011-08-2626NOTICE Of Filing Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Federal Bureau of Prisons (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Ben-David, Neeli) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
2011-08-2627DEPOSITION of LILA C. THOMPSON taken on 6/17/11 by Federal Bureau of Prisons. (bse) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
2011-09-1528NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Prisons re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment To Substitute Declaration Of Lieutenant Kim Humphrey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Humphrey Declaration))(Ben-David, Neeli) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
2011-09-1629RESPONSE in Opposition re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response Requesting Summary Judgment be Denied filed by Lila C. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts Plaintiff's Material Issue of Fact, # 2 Statement of Material Facts Plantiff's Responses to Defendant's Material Issue of Fact)(Sykes, Tamika) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
2011-09-20Submission of 25 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Medical Records Under Seal, submitted to District Judge J. Owen Forrester. (beg) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
2011-10-0330REPLY BRIEF re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Ben-David, Neeli) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
2011-10-0331Response to Statement of Material Facts re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Ben-David, Neeli) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
2011-10-11Submission of 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment, submitted to District Judge J. Owen Forrester. (beg) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
2011-12-09MINUTE ORDER by Judge J. Owen Forrester granting 25 Motion for Leave to File. (pkl) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
2011-12-1432NOTICE Of Filing Manual Filing of Medical Records Under Seal by Federal Bureau of Prisons (Ben-David, Neeli) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
2011-12-1433Medical Records ( FILED UNDER SEAL ) by Federal Bureau of Prisons. (beg) (Additional attachment(s) added and verified by dr on 12/14/2011: # 1 Medical Report) (beg). (Entered: 12/14/2011)
2012-01-2034ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time and granting Defendant's 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is DIRECTED to DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge J. Owen Forrester on 1/20/12. (beg) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
2012-01-20Civil Case Terminated. (beg) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
2012-01-2335CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered for Defendant and against Plaintiff for costs. (beg)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 01/23/2012)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar