Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleButts et al v. Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society, The et al
DistrictDistrict of Minnesota
CityDMN
Case Number0:2010cv00630
Date Filed2010-03-04
Date Closed2010-05-12
JudgeJudge Joan N. Ericksen
PlaintiffBeverly Butts by and through her Power of Attorney, Kathy Iverson
PlaintiffKenneth Hojberg by and through his Power of Attorney, LeeAnn Hojberg
PlaintiffClare Knutson by and through her Power of Attorney, Paul Knutson
PlaintiffSylvia Wulff by and through her Power of Attorney, Morris Blom
DefendantEvangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society, The individually
doing business as Good Samaritan Society-Albert Lea
DefendantBrianna Broitzman
DefendantAshton Larson
DefendantKaylee Nash
DefendantUnited States Department of Health and Human Services
DefendantAlicia Heilmann
DefendantMinnesota Department of Health
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-03-041NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Department of Health and Human Services from Freeborn County District Court, case number 24-cv-10-129. Assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Master list and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel, filed by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Summons and Complaint, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Notice of Filing, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Certificate of Service) (RLR) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
2010-03-152ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2010 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/15/10. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(LPH) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
2010-03-183NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen O Plunkett on behalf of Brianna Broitzman, Alicia Heilmann, Ashton Larson, Kaylee Nash. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Plunkett, Stephen) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
2010-03-194MOTION to Remand to State Court by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
2010-03-195NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
2010-03-196MEMORANDUM in Support re 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
2010-03-197AFFIDAVIT of Joel E. Smith in SUPPORT OF 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
2010-03-198LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff re 6 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
2010-03-199CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff re 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court, 7 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 5 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 8 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
2010-03-2610MOTION to Compel Return of Documents by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Wilhelm, D) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
2010-03-2611NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 10 MOTION to Compel Return of Documents : Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Wilhelm, D) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
2010-03-2612MEMORANDUM by United States Department of Health and Human Services re 10 MOTION to Compel Return of Documents , 11 Notice of Hearing on Motion Opposing Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and to Release Uncensored Documents, and in Support of Motion to Compel Return of Documents filed by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wilhelm, D) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
2010-03-2613EXHIBIT A re 12 Memorandum, by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(Wilhelm, D) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
2010-03-2614CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Department of Health and Human Services re 10 MOTION to Compel Return of Documents , 12 Memorandum, 11 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 13 Exhibits. (Wilhelm, D) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
2010-04-0115BRIEF Response to Notice of Intervention . (Kosieradzki, Mark) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
2010-04-0116CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff re 15 Brief Response to Notice of Intervention . (Kosieradzki, Mark) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
2010-04-0517ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sylvia Wulff, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Beverly Butts to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on April 5, 2010. (slf) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
2010-04-0618MOTION to Intervene by Minnesota Department of Health. (Manka, Audrey) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
2010-04-0619NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 18 MOTION to Intervene : Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Manka, Audrey) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
2010-04-0620MEMORANDUM in Support re 18 MOTION to Intervene filed by Minnesota Department of Health. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Manka, Audrey) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
2010-04-0621CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Minnesota Department of Health re 19 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 18 MOTION to Intervene, 20 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Manka, Audrey) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
2010-04-0822NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara A Zurek on behalf of Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society, The. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Zurek, Barbara) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
2010-04-2323REPLY to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION to Compel Return of Documents AND OPPOSING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
2010-04-2324AFFIDAVIT of Joel E. Smith in SUPPORT OF 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Exhibit(s), # 3 Exhibit(s), # 4 Exhibit(s), # 5 Exhibit(s), # 6 Exhibit(s), # 7 Exhibit(s), # 8 Exhibit(s), # 9 Exhibit(s), # 10 Exhibit(s), # 11 Exhibit(s))(Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
2010-04-2325LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff re 23 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
2010-04-2326CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff re 25 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 23 Reply to Response to Motion, 24 Affidavit in Support of Motion. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
2010-04-2727REPORT 26f by Brianna Broitzman, Beverly Butts, Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society, The, Alicia Heilmann, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Ashton Larson, Minnesota Department of Health, Kaylee Nash, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Sylvia Wulff. (Wilhelm, D) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
2010-04-3028MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Compel Return of Documents filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
2010-04-3029AFFIDAVIT of Joel E. Smith in OPPOSITION TO 10 MOTION to Compel Return of Documents filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
2010-04-3030LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff re 28 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
2010-04-3031CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff re 29 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 28 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 30 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
2010-04-3032MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Intervene filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
2010-04-3033AFFIDAVIT of Joel E. Smith in OPPOSITION TO 18 MOTION to Intervene filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
2010-04-3034LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff re 32 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
2010-04-3035CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff re 34 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 32 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 33 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
2010-05-0336STIPULATION for Remand by Brianna Broitzman, Beverly Butts, Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society, The, Alicia Heilmann, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Ashton Larson, Minnesota Department of Health, Kaylee Nash, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Sylvia Wulff. (Wilhelm, D) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
2010-05-03***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: Pretrial conference scheduled for May 4, 2010, and the motion hearing scheduled for May 7, 2010, before Magistrate Judge Noel are all canceled, in light of the stipulation for remand. (CAO) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
2010-05-0337NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion re 10 MOTION to Compel Return of Documents by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Wilhelm, D) Modified text on 5/4/2010 (kt). (Entered: 05/03/2010)
2010-05-0438NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion re 18 MOTION to Intervene by Minnesota Department of Health. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Manka, Audrey) Modified text on 5/5/2010 (kt). (Entered: 05/04/2010)
2010-05-1239ORDER re 36 Stipulation, filed by Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society, The, Sylvia Wulff, Clare Knutson, Minnesota Department of Health, Brianna Broitzman, Ashton Larson, Alicia Heilmann, Kenneth Hojberg, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Kaylee Nash, Beverly Butts. This matter is remanded to the Minnesota State District Court in Freeborn County, Minnesota. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on May 12, 2010. (slf) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar