Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleStrom v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2011cv00926
Date Filed2011-02-09
Date Closed2012-02-02
JudgeHonorable James B. Zagel
PlaintiffWarren E Strom
DefendantUnited States Department of Agriculture
DefendantNatural Resources Conservation Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2011-02-091COMPLAINT filed by Warren E Strom; Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-5690844. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Elliott, Timothy) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
2011-02-092CIVIL Cover Sheet (Elliott, Timothy) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
2011-02-093ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Warren E Strom by Timothy D. Elliott (Elliott, Timothy) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
2011-02-09CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable James B. Zagel. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. (daj, ) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
2011-02-10SUMMONS Issued as to Natural Resources Conservation Service, United States Department of Agriculture, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ef, ) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
2011-02-164ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Warren E Strom by Ann Marie Lampariello Perez (Lampariello Perez, Ann) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
2011-03-075NOTICE by Ann Marie Lampariello Perez of Change of Address (Lampariello Perez, Ann) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
2011-03-086AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Warren E Strom regarding Complaint and Summons served on Patrick Fitzgerald, U.S. Attorney on 02/10/2011 (Elliott, Timothy) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
2011-03-087AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Warren E Strom regarding Complaint and Summons served on Eric Holder, United States Attorney General on 02/10/2011 (Elliott, Timothy) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
2011-03-088AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Warren E Strom regarding Complaint and Summons served on Thomas Ryterske, District Conservationist, NRCS St. Charles Service Center Office on 02/10/2011 (Elliott, Timothy) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
2011-03-089AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Warren E Strom regarding Complaint and Summons served on Nancy Phalen, State Administrative Officer, NRCS Illinois Office on 02/10/2011 (Elliott, Timothy) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
2011-03-0810SUMMONS Returned Executed by Warren E Strom as to Natural Resources Conservation Service served on 2/10/2011, answer due 4/11/2011 (Elliott, Timothy) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
2011-04-2111ANSWER to Complaint by United States Department of Agriculture(Chahal, Harpreet) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
2011-04-2112CERTIFICATE of Service by Harpreet Kaur Chahal on behalf of United States Department of Agriculture regarding answer to complaint 11 (Chahal, Harpreet) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
2011-08-0213MOTION by Plaintiff Warren E Strom to compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Elliott, Timothy) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
2011-08-0214NOTICE of Motion by Timothy D. Elliott for presentment of motion to compel 13 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 8/4/2011 at 10:15 AM. (Elliott, Timothy) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
2011-08-0315RESPONSE by Defendant United States Department of Agriculture to motion to compel 13 (Chahal, Harpreet) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
2011-08-0416MINUTE entry before Honorable James B. Zagel: Motion hearing held on 8/4/2011. Motion to compel 13 reply due by 8/11/2011. Oral motion for entry of a protective order is granted. Status hearing set for 8/18/2011 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice (drw, ) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
2011-08-1117RESPONSE by Plaintiff Warren E Strom to Defendants' Motion for a Protective Order and Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Lampariello Perez, Ann) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
2011-08-1818MINUTE entry before Honorable James B. Zagel:Status hearing held on 8/18/2011. Status hearing set for 9/1/2011 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice (drw, ) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
2011-09-0119MINUTE entry before Honorable James B. Zagel:Status hearing held on 9/1/2011. Status hearing set for 9/22/2011 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice (drw, ) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
2011-09-2220MINUTE entry before Honorable James B. Zagel:Status hearing held on 9/22/2011. Status hearing set for 10/28/2011 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice (drw, ) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
2011-10-2821MINUTE entry before Honorable James B. Zagel:Status hearing held on 10/28/2011. Fee petition due on 11/11/2011. Defendants response 12/9/2011. Status hearing set for 12/22/2011 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice (drw, ) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
2011-11-1422PETITION For Fees and Costs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D)(Elliott, Timothy) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
2011-12-0523MOTION by Defendant United States Department of Agriculture for extension of time to file response/reply as to petition 22 for costs and fees (Chahal, Harpreet) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
2011-12-0524NOTICE of Motion by Harpreet Kaur Chahal for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief 23 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 12/15/2011 at 10:15 AM. (Chahal, Harpreet) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
2011-12-1525MINUTE entry before Honorable James B. Zagel:Notice of motion hearing stricken. Motion for extension of time to file response/reply 23 is granted. Fee petition response now due 12/22/2011. Reply now due 1/5/2012. Status hearing (12-22-2011) is reset for 1/18/2012 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice(drw, ) (srb, ). (Entered: 12/15/2011)
2012-01-1026NOTICE of Correction regarding document number 25 . (srb,) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
2012-01-1827ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Warren E Strom by Kaitlyn Anne Wild (Wild, Kaitlyn) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
2012-01-1828MINUTE entry before Honorable James B. Zagel: Status hearing reset for 2/2/2012 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice (drw, ) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
2012-02-0229MINUTE entry before Honorable James B. Zagel:Status hearing held on 2/2/2012. Case is dismissed by agreement of the parties with leave to reinstate on or by 3/15/2012. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (drw, ) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar