Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleA.F. Rothschild Fund v. Department of Health and Human Services et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2011cv02760
Date Filed2011-06-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Laurel Beeler
PlaintiffA.F. Rothschild Fund
DefendantDepartment of Health and Human Services
DefendantCenters for Disease Control and Prevention
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2011-06-071COMPLAINT against Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Department of Health and Human Services (Filing fee $350, receipt number 34611060707). Filed by A.F. Rothschild Fund. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2011: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/10/2011)
2011-06-072MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Eric R. Glitzenstein (Filing fee $275, receipt number 34611060720) filed by A.F. Rothschild Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
2011-06-073MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Howard M. Crystal (Filing fee $275, receipt number 34611060720) filed by A.F. Rothschild Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
2011-06-074Summons Issued as to Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Department of Health and Human Services. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011) (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/10/2011)
2011-06-075ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2011. Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
2011-06-07CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
2011-06-106Certificate of Interested Entities by A.F. Rothschild Fund (Plater, Brent) (Filed on 6/10/2011) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
2011-06-107CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by A.F. Rothschild Fund (Plater, Brent) (Filed on 6/10/2011) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
2011-06-178CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by A.F. Rothschild Fund.. (Plater, Brent) (Filed on 6/17/2011) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
2011-06-299Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re: Howard M. Crystal. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2011) Modified on 6/30/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/29/2011)
2011-06-2910Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re: Eric R. Glizenstein. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2011) Modified on 6/30/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/29/2011)
2011-07-0111STIPULATION RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Department of Health and Human Services. (Reding, Ann) (Filed on 7/1/2011) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
2011-07-0112CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Department of Health and Human Services.. (Reding, Ann) (Filed on 7/1/2011) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
2011-08-0513DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION, MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Department of Health and Human Services. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 8/19/2011. Replies due by 8/26/2011. (Reding, Ann) (Filed on 8/5/2011) Modified on 8/8/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/15/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/05/2011)
2011-08-0514Declaration of Katherine S. Norris in Support of 13 DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION, MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byCenters for Disease Control and Prevention, Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 18)(Related document(s) 13 ) (Reding, Ann) (Filed on 8/5/2011) Modified on 8/8/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/05/2011)
2011-08-0515Declaration of Carol Maloney in Support of 13 DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION, MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Errata 1 - 10)(Related document(s) 13 ) (Reding, Ann) (Filed on 8/5/2011) Modified on 8/8/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/05/2011)
2011-08-0516Declaration of Robert Eckert in Support of 13 DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION, MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 4)(Related document(s) 13 ) (Reding, Ann) (Filed on 8/5/2011) Modified on 8/8/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/05/2011)
2011-08-0517Proposed Order re 13 DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION, MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Department of Health and Human Services. (Reding, Ann) (Filed on 8/5/2011) Modified on 8/8/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/05/2011)
2011-08-1218STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time To Respond to 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by A.F. Rothschild Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Crystal, Howard) (Filed on 8/12/2011) Modified on 8/15/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/12/2011)
2011-08-1919ORDER DENYING EXTENSION. Signed by Judge Beeler on 8/19/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
2011-09-0620RESPONSE and [Proposed] Order (re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint) filed byA.F. Rothschild Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Frank Rothschild, # 2 Proposed Order)(Crystal, Howard) (Filed on 9/6/2011) Modified on 9/7/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/06/2011)
2011-09-1321REPLY (re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed byCenters for Disease Control and Prevention, Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration LASHONDA SCHOFIELD, # 2 Exhibit 1 - 5)(Reding, Ann) (Filed on 9/13/2011) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
2011-09-2622ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS OPTIONAL SUR-REPLY. Signed by Judge Beeler on 9/26/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
2011-09-2923NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Marie Reding (Reding, Ann) (Filed on 9/29/2011) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
2011-09-2924Sur-Reply (re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint) filed by A.F. Rothschild Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 30)(Crystal, Howard) (Filed on 9/29/2011) Modified on 9/30/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/29/2011)
2011-10-0625Minute Entry: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Hearing held on 10/6/2011 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler (Date Filed: 10/6/2011). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/6/2011) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
2011-12-0226Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler deferring ruling on 13 Motion to Dismiss.(lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
2011-12-1527JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Department of Health and Human Services, A.F. Rothschild Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reding, Ann) (Filed on 12/15/2011) Modified on 12/16/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/15/2011)
2011-12-2128NOTICE of Filing re 27 Joint Case Management Statement filed by A.F. Rothschild Fund (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment)(Glitzenstein, Eric) (Filed on 12/21/2011) Modified on 12/22/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/21/2011)
2011-12-2229Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/22/2011 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler (Date Filed: 12/22/2011). Case Management Statement due by 3/8/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2012 at 10:30 A.M. (Recording #FTR: 10:51-11:05) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/22/2011) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
2012-01-0630STIPULATION and Proposed Order Re Completion of the Administrative Appeals Process by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Department of Health and Human Services and A.F. Rothschild Fund. (Reding, Ann) (Filed on 1/6/2012) Modified on 1/9/2012 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/06/2012)
2012-01-1131ORDER re 30 Stipulation, filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, A.F. Rothschild Fund, Department of Health and Human Services. Signed by Judge Beeler on 1/11/2012. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012) (Entered: 01/11/2012)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar