Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUZEY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02096
Date Filed2021-08-03
Date Closed2025-03-03
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffMICHAEL PAUL PUZEY
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFBI
DefendantDEA
DefendantATE
DefendantEOUSA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [77]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-03Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 08/03/2021. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (znmg) (Entered: 08/05/2021)
2021-08-031COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits, # 2 Summons)(znmg) (Entered: 08/05/2021)
2021-08-032MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (znmg) (Entered: 08/05/2021)
2021-08-033Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY (znmg) (Entered: 08/05/2021)
2021-08-034MOTION to Appoint Counsel by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (znmg) (Entered: 08/05/2021)
2021-08-255PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/25/2021. (zsb) (Entered: 08/27/2021)
2021-09-03Filing fee received: $ 350, receipt number: 200525. (znm) (Entered: 09/08/2021)
2021-09-236ORDER denying as moot 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying without prejudice 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (See order for details). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/23/2021. (zsb) (Entered: 10/01/2021)
2021-09-27Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 10/01/2021)
2021-11-04MINUTE ORDER: The Court hereby directs the Clerk's Office to issue blank summonses to Plaintiff. Further, Plaintiff is not proceeding in forma pauperis and is therefore responsible for arranging to have the summonses and a copy of the complaint served on the defendants in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(c). Moreover, Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) provides a period of 90 days to serve defendants. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall effect service on the defendants in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 within 90 days of the Clerk's Office issuing the summonses. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/4/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 11/04/2021)
2022-02-099AFFIDAVIT of Mailing re 1 Complaint by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (znmw) (Entered: 03/21/2022)
2022-02-14MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: It appears from the docket that Plaintiff, who initiated this action on August 3, 2021, has yet to effectuate service on the Defendants. Further, on November 4, 2021, the Court ordered the Clerk's Office to issue summonses to Plaintiff so that he could effectuate service, and the Court provided Plaintiff 90 days to effectuate service. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff SHOW CAUSE, in writing, on or before March 1, 2022, why the claims against Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to effectuate service. Plaintiff's failure to effectuate service or to satisfactorily respond to the present order may result in the dismissal of his claims without further notice. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/14/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 02/14/2022)
2022-03-08VACATED PURSANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 3/10/2022.....MINUTE ORDER: It appears from the docket that Plaintiff, who initiated this action on August 3, 2021, has not yet effectuated service on Defendants. The Court issued a Minute Order, dated November 4, 2021, directing the Clerk's Office to issue blank summonses to Plaintiff and directing Plaintiff to effect service on Defendants within 90 days. Further, Plaintiff did not file a response to the Minute Order to Show Cause, dated February 14, 2022, which informed Plaintiff that failure to file a response by March 1, 2022 would result in the dismissal of his claims without further notice. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/8/2022. (lccrc3) Modified on 3/31/2022 (znmw). (Entered: 03/08/2022)
2022-03-087AFFIDAVIT of Mailing Summonses by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (znmw) (Entered: 03/09/2022)
2022-03-088RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT (Letter dated 2/20/2022) re Order to Show Cause, filed by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (znmw) (Entered: 03/09/2022)
2022-03-10MINUTE ORDER: The Court's Minute Order dated March 8, 2022, which dismissed this case without prejudice, is hereby VACATED. Plaintiff's response to the Minute Order to Show Cause was timely submitted, but it did not appear on the docket until soon after the Court issued its March 8 Minute Order. Further, in light of the 8 Response to the Order to Show Cause, the Court's February 14, 2022 Minute Order to Show Cause is discharged. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/10/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 03/10/2022)
2022-03-15MINUTE ORDER: It appears from the record that summonses have not yet been issued in this case. Plaintiff has included summonses in his 7 Affidavit of Mailing. The Clerk's Office is hereby directed to issue those summonses. Further, Plaintiff is not proceeding in forma pauperis and is therefore responsible for arranging to have the summonses and a copy of the complaint served on the defendants in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(c). Moreover, Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) provides a period of 90 days to serve defendants. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall effect service on the defendants in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 within 90 days of the Clerk's Office issuing the summonses mentioned above. So Ordered by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/15/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 03/15/2022)
2022-03-2210SUMMONS (6) Issued as to ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General; sent to plaintiff by mail. (znmw) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-3111MOTION for Relief from Judgment by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. "Leave to File Granted. File as Motion for Relief from Judgment only, as the case has been reinstated. Denial of motion as moot will be issued by separate order." Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/31/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(znmw) (Entered: 03/31/2022)
2022-04-01MINUTE ORDER: The 11 Motion for Relief from Judgment is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Per the Court's Minute Order dated 3/10/2022, the case has been reinstated. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/1/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-1812NOTICE of Change of Address by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY (znmw) (Entered: 04/20/2022)
2022-04-22MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the 12 Notice of Change of Address, and it appears from the record that, due to Plaintiff's change of facilities, he never received the previously issued summonses. The Clerk's Office is hereby directed to re-issue the summonses and send them to Plaintiff's new address. As previously explained, Plaintiff is not proceeding in forma pauperis and is therefore responsible for arranging to have the summonses and a copy of the complaint served on the defendants in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(c). Moreover, Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) provides a period of 90 days to serve defendants. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall effect service on the defendants in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 within 90 days of the Clerk's Office re-issuing the summonses. So Ordered by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/22/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-25SUMMONS (6) REISSUED as to ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General; sent to plaintiff by mail. (znmw) (Entered: 04/25/2022)
2022-05-0313NOTICE of Change of Address by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY (znmw) (Entered: 05/04/2022)
2022-05-2314NOTICE by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY re 13 Notice of Change of Address, Minute Order filed 4/22/2022. (znmw) (Entered: 05/24/2022)
2022-06-0815NOTICE of Change of Address by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY (zjm) (Entered: 06/09/2022)
2022-06-1716Mail Returned as Undeliverable re Minute Order dated 4/1/2022 on Motion for Relief from Judgment Sent to Michael Puzey. New Address not provided; unable to forward. (lsj) (Entered: 06/17/2022)
2022-06-2217NOTICE by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY (zjm) (Entered: 06/27/2022)
2022-07-1118NOTICE by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY (zjm) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-1119NOTICE of Change of Address by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY (zjm) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-14MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's 18 and 19 Notices, and it appears from the record that, due to Plaintiff's change of facilities, he has still not received the previously issued summonses. The Clerk's Office is hereby directed to re-issue the summonses and send them to Plaintiff's new address. As previously explained, Plaintiff is not proceeding in forma pauperis and is therefore responsible for arranging to have the summonses and a copy of the complaint served on the defendants in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(c). Moreover, Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) provides a period of 90 days to serve defendants. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall effect service on the defendants in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 within 90 days of the Clerk's Office re-issuing the summonses. So Ordered by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/14/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-1821MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (zjm) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-1920SUMMONS (6) REISSUED as to ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General; sent to plaintiff by mail. (zjm) (Entered: 07/19/2022)
2022-07-21MINUTE ORDER: The Court grants the 21 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants. It appears from the docket that summons were reissued to Plaintiff at his new address on July 19, 2022. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall have until October 17, 2022, to effect service on the defendants in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/21/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-08-0422RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/2/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/1/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ATE served on 11/23/2021; DEA served on 11/22/2021; EOUSA served on 11/26/2021; FBI served on 11/22/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/22/2022. (zjm) (Entered: 08/05/2022)
2022-08-1023AFFIDAVIT of Mailing as to United States Attorney, United States Attorney General, FBI, EOUSA, DEA, and ATF by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (zjm) (Entered: 08/11/2022)
2022-08-3024Mail Returned as Undeliverable re Minute Order entered on 7/14/2022 sent to Michael Puzey. New Address not provided, unable to forward. (lsj) (Entered: 08/30/2022)
2022-09-0725NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Aaron Caplen on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 09/07/2022)
2022-09-0726MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 09/07/2022)
2022-09-08MINUTE ORDER granting the 26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file an answer on or before November 15, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/08/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/08/2022)
2022-09-1327MOTION for Entry of Default, MOTION for Default Judgment under FRCVP 55 by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (zjm) (Entered: 09/16/2022)
2022-09-19MINUTE ORDER denying 27 Motion for Entry of Default and Motion for Default Judgment. On September 7, 2022, defendants filed a 26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the complaint. On September 8, 2022, the Court directed defendants to answer by November 15, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/19/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-10-1128MOTION to Amend; MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits or Discovery Evidence to Support Complaint by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibits)(zjm) (Entered: 10/19/2022)
2022-10-26MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's 28 Motion to Amend and/or Submit Discovery Evidence is hereby DENIED. To the extent the Plaintiff's proposed evidentiary submissions relate to his challenge to his underlying conviction in the Northern District of West Virginia, the Court likely lacks jurisdiction over that claim. And the Plaintiff's FOIA claim will be decided, if necessary, based on the submission of declarations by the government and briefing by both sides following any production of records called for in the Plaintiff's FOIA request. SO ORDERED by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/26/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 10/26/2022)
2022-11-1529MOTION to Dismiss by ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 11/15/2022)
2022-11-1730Order advising plaintiff to respond to 29 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by December 21, 2022 or Court may deem matter as conceded. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/17/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 11/17/2022)
2022-11-2131NOTICE of Change of Address by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY (zjm) (Entered: 11/29/2022)
2022-11-2832RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 30 Fox/Neal Order, filed by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (zmrl) (Entered: 12/02/2022)
2022-11-2834MOTION to Stay re 30 Fox/Neal Order, by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (See Docket Entry 32 to view document) (zjm) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
2022-12-01MINUTE ORDER: In light of 31 Plaintiff's Notice of Change of Address, Plaintiff's response deadline set forth in the Court's 30 November 17, 2022 Order is vacated. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by January 23, 2023. If Plaintiff does not file a response within the time provided, the Court will treat the motion as conceded and may summarily dismiss the case. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/01/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-0233NOTICE by ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 12/02/2022)
2022-12-0635MOTION for Order by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED" by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/06/2022. (zjm) (Entered: 12/08/2022)
2022-12-0736NOTICE of Change of Address by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY (zjm) (Entered: 12/14/2022)
2022-12-09MINUTE ORDER: With respect to Plaintiff's recently docketed 34 November 9 and 35 November 21 "Letter/Motion[s]," the Court notes that Plaintiff's address of record has been updated on the docket, and the due date for his opposition to the government's motion to dismiss has been extended to January 23, 2023 due to his transfer. The Court declines to intervene in any dispute between Plaintiff and his former facility regarding the handling of his legal materials. Any such disputes should be raised administratively with the facility or the Bureau of Prisons. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/09/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 12/09/2022)
2023-01-1837Memorandum in opposition to re 29 Motion to Dismiss filed by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (zjm) (Entered: 01/20/2023)
2023-01-2538REPLY to opposition to motion re 29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 01/25/2023)
2023-02-0339NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brian J. Levy on behalf of ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Robert A. Caplen (Levy, Brian) (Entered: 02/03/2023)
2023-07-07MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint in its entirety for lack of proper service is hereby DENIED. While Plaintiff apparently did not attach all pages of the complaint to the summons served upon the Defendants, parts of the complaint were attached, which was sufficient to put the government on notice of the case and, with a modicum of research, the claims being asserted. Given that Plaintiff is incarcerated and proceeding pro se, the Court will excuse any technical deficiencies in service. Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Section 1983 claim for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is GRANTED, as the federal government is not a proper defendant in a Section 1983 action. See Ramirez v. United States Park Police , No. 22-CV-187 (CRC), 2023 WL 1438395, at *2 (D.D.C. Feb. 1, 2023). Finally, to the extent Plaintiff seeks to challenge his underlying conviction and sentence through a claim sounding in habeas corpus, the government's motion to dismiss such a claim is GRANTED. Habeas petitions must be brought against the warden of the inmate's facility, which here is located in the Middle District of Pennsylvania. This Court therefore lacks venue over any habeas claim. The government shall respond to Plaintiff's remaining FOIA/Privacy Act claim by August 21, 2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 07/07/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/07/2023)
2023-07-1140LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY - Letter This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. "LEAVE TO FILE DENIED. Not a proper filing. The clerk's office sends all docketed notices and orders to the defendant." Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 07/11/2023. (zjm) (Entered: 07/18/2023)
2023-08-2142NOTICE of Change of Address by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY (zjm) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-08-2241MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,,,, by ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Answer, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 08/22/2023)
2023-08-23MINUTE ORDER granting 41 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants' answer shall be due by August 22, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/23/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 08/23/2023)
2023-08-23MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The Government is hereby ORDERED to file a proposed schedule for processing the plaintiff's FOIA request by September 6, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/23/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 08/23/2023)
2023-08-2543NOTICE of Change of Address by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY (zjm) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-09-0644STATUS REPORT by ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-07MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 44 Defendants' Status Report, the Defendants shall file a further status report by November 13, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/7/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/07/2023)
2023-09-1945Memorandum in opposition to re 41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, filed by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (zjm) (Entered: 09/21/2023)
2023-09-22MINUTE ORDER: In light of 45 Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition, the government is directed in its November 13, 2023 status report to respond to Plaintiff's representation that he has not received the 95 documents released by the FBI on August 21, 2023. The government is further directed to contact the agency to whom the FBI referred four pages to request an estimated completion date for the consultation. The government shall provide an update on that consultation in the November 13, 2023 status report. SO ORDERED by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/22/2023.(lccrc3) (Entered: 09/22/2023)
2023-11-1346STATUS REPORT by ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 11/13/2023)
2023-11-14MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 46 Defendants' Status Report, the Defendants are directed to file a further status report by January 17, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/14/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 11/14/2023)
2023-11-2047NOTICE by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY (zjm) (Entered: 11/29/2023)
2023-11-30MINUTE ORDER: Defendants are directed to respond, in writing, by December 8, 2023, to the representation in 47 Plaintiff's notice that he has not received the produced documents and status reports. Defendants shall confirm in their submission whether they have sent those documents to Plaintiff's current facility. SO ORDERED by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/30/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 11/30/2023)
2023-12-0848RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, Set Deadlines, by ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re Order,, Set Deadlines, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Levy, Brian) Modified on 12/8/2023 to correct event (zjm). (Entered: 12/08/2023)
2023-12-1149AFFIDAVIT by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(zjm) (Entered: 12/14/2023)
2024-01-1750STATUS REPORT by ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 01/17/2024)
2024-01-22MINUTE ORDER: In light of 50 Defendants' Status Report, the Defendants are directed to file a further status report by March 18, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/22/2024. (lccrc3) (Entered: 01/22/2024)
2024-02-0551MOTION for Default Judgment as to by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in support of Request, # 2 Affidavit of Clarification of the facts)(zjm) (Entered: 02/08/2024)
2024-02-2152Memorandum in opposition to re 51 Motion for Default Judgment filed by ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 02/21/2024)
2024-03-0753NOTICE of Non-Response by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY (zjm) (Entered: 03/08/2024)
2024-03-0754REPLY to opposition to motion re 51 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit)(zjm) (Entered: 03/08/2024)
2024-03-1855STATUS REPORT by ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 03/18/2024)
2024-03-20MINUTE ORDER: In light of 55 Defendants' Status Report, the Defendants are hereby directed to file a further status report by May 17, 2024. Defendants shall propose a schedule for summary judgment briefing in that report. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/20/2024. (lccrc3) (Entered: 03/20/2024)
2024-04-0256OPINION AND ORDER denying 51 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. See full Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/2/2024. (lccrc3) (Entered: 04/02/2024)
2024-05-1757STATUS REPORT by ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 05/17/2024)
2024-05-22MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is directed to SHOW CAUSE in writing, by June 5, 2024, why this case should not be dismissed as moot given that Plaintiff has not raised any objections to the reasonableness of Defendants' Freedom of Information Act searches or any issues with respect to Defendants' final production of records. SO ORDERED by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/22/2024. (lccrc3) (Entered: 05/22/2024)
2024-05-2358MOTION for Summary Judgment by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED." signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 05/23/2024 (zjm) (Entered: 05/24/2024)
2024-05-24MINUTE ORDER: In light of 58 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, the Court's May 22, 2024 Order to Show Cause is hereby DISCHARGED. The Court understands Plaintiff's Motion to challenge the adequacy of Defendants' search. Defendants shall file a combined opposition and cross-motion by June 24, 2024 and shall indicate whether any records were withheld pursuant to an exemption. Plaintiff shall file a combined reply and opposition to Defendants' motion by July 24, 2024. Defendants shall file their reply by August 7, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/24/2024. (lccrc3) (Entered: 05/24/2024)
2024-05-2859NOTICE of Exhibits by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED." signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 05/28/2024 (zjm) (Entered: 05/30/2024)
2024-06-1060RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 5/22/2024 MINUTE Order to Show Cause, by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (zjm) Modified event on 6/18/2024 (mg). (Entered: 06/17/2024)
2024-06-18MINUTE ORDER: In light of 60 Plaintiff's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause, the Court notes that it has already discharged the May 22, 2024 Order based on 58 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Further, the Court presumes that Defendants are prepared to address in their upcoming opposition and cross-motion any Exemption 7 withholdings they may have claimed, but, if not, Defendants are directed to address Plaintiff's suggestion in the 60 Response that Defendants withheld records pursuant to Exemption 7. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/18/2024. (lccrc3) (Entered: 06/18/2024)
2024-06-1861MOTION to Modify the Briefing Schedule by ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 06/18/2024)
2024-06-21MINUTE ORDER granting 61 Defendants' Motion to Modify the Briefing Schedule. The Court hereby adjusts the briefing schedule as follows. Defendants shall file their combined opposition and cross-motion by July 15, 2024. Plaintiff shall file his combined reply and opposition to Defendants' motion by August 14, 2024. Defendants shall file their reply by August 28, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/21/2024. (lccrc3) (Entered: 06/21/2024)
2024-07-1062MOTION to Modify the Briefing Schedule by ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 07/10/2024)
2024-07-1163Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Certificate of Service)(zjm) (Entered: 07/24/2024)
2024-07-12MINUTE ORDER granting 62 Defendants' Motion to Modify the Briefing Schedule. The Court hereby adjusts the briefing schedule as follows. Defendants shall file their combined opposition and cross-motion by July 29, 2024. Plaintiff shall file his combined reply and opposition to Defendants' motion by August 28, 2024. Defendants shall file their reply by September 11, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/12/2024. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/12/2024)
2024-07-2964Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit Delo, # 3 Exhibit Delo Decl Exhibits, # 4 Declaration Kravitz, # 5 Exhibit Kravitz Decl Exhibits, # 6 Declaration Seidel, # 7 Exhibit Seidel Decl Exhibits, # 8 Declaration Finney, # 9 Exhibit EOUSA Vaughn Index, # 10 Declaration Collins, # 11 Text of Proposed Order, # 12 Certificate of Service)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 07/29/2024)
2024-07-2965Memorandum in opposition to re 63 Motion for Summary Judgment, 58 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Delo, # 2 Exhibit Delo Decl Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit Kravitz, # 4 Exhibit Kravitz Decl Exhibits, # 5 Declaration Seidel, # 6 Exhibit Seidel Decl Exhibits, # 7 Declaration Finney, # 8 Exhibit EOUSA Vaughn Index, # 9 Declaration Collins, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 07/29/2024)
2024-07-3166ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond to 64 Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by August 28, 2024, or the Court may deem the matter as conceded. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/31/2024. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/31/2024)
2024-09-0367RESPONSE re 64 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (zdp) (Entered: 09/05/2024)
2024-09-0368REPLY to opposition to motion re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (zdp) (Entered: 09/05/2024)
2024-09-0569MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 64 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 09/05/2024)
2024-09-06MINUTE ORDER granting 69 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file their reply in further support of 64 their motion for summary judgment by October 1, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/6/24. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/06/2024)
2024-09-0670AFFIDAVIT of Negative Averment by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (zdp) (Main Document 70 replaced on 9/11/2024) (zdp). (Entered: 09/10/2024)
2024-09-1071MOTION for Extension of Time to File Statement of Facts Nunc Pro Tunc by ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 09/10/2024)
2024-09-1072ERRATA Statement of Facts by ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 64 Motion for Summary Judgment,. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 09/10/2024)
2024-09-12MINUTE ORDER granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/12/24. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/12/2024)
2024-09-16MINUTE ORDER: In his 70 Affidavit, Plaintiff once again claims he did not receive the FBI's 99-page production and indicates that he did not receive the Defendants' Answer. Although the Court believes Defendants have previously addressed the mailing of this production, out of an abundance of caution, the Defendants are directed to file a status report by September 20, 2024, that (1) lists all the times Defendants mailed the FBI's production to Plaintiff and the address for each mailing (along with any other information pertinent to Defendant's claim) and (2) indicates the address at which Defendants served Mr. Puzey with Defendants' Answer and whether that address was Mr. Puzey's address at the time of service. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/16/24. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/16/2024)
2024-09-2073STATUS REPORT by ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECF No 41, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 09/20/2024)
2024-10-0174REPLY to opposition to motion re 64 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ATE, DEA, EOUSA, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 10/01/2024)
2024-10-1875MOTION for Extension of Time by MICHAEL PAUL PUZEY. (zdp) (Entered: 10/22/2024)
2024-10-23MINUTE ORDER denying 75 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has already responded to Defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment, see ECF 67 . Plaintiff has not shown why filing a further response is necessary. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/23/24. (lccrc3) (Entered: 10/23/2024)
2025-02-2876ORDER denying 58 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, denying 63 Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Summary Judgment, and granting 64 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. See full Order and accompanying Memorandum Opinion for details. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/28/25. (lccrc3) (Entered: 02/28/2025)
2025-02-2877MEMORANDUM OPINION re 76 Order Denying 58 and 63 Plaintiff's Motions for Summary Judgment and Granting 64 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. See full Memorandum Opinion for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/28/25. (lccrc3) (Entered: 02/28/2025)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar