Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBECKER v. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2024cv00152
Date Filed2024-01-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffCRAIG R BECKER LT, USN
Case DescriptionNavy Lieutenant Craig Becker was convicted in Belgium of killing his wife when she fell out of the window of their apartment. Becker successfully tried to get the U.S. to take jurisdiction over his case. After the Navy took jurisdiction, Becker was court-martialed and convicted. Becker submitted a FOIA request to the Navy for records concerning the agency's decision to assume jurisdiction of his case. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Becker filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2024-01-181COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10625300) filed by CRAIG R BECKER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Summons FOIA Summons Navy, # 9 Summons FOIA Summons Atty Gen, # 10 Summons FOIA Summons USAO DC, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sheldon, David) (Entered: 01/18/2024)
2024-01-19Case Assigned to Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (zcb) (Entered: 01/19/2024)
2024-01-192SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 01/19/2024)
2024-02-213RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/31/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/1/2024. (Sheldon, David) (Entered: 02/21/2024)
2024-02-214RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/31/2024. (Sheldon, David) (Entered: 02/21/2024)
2024-02-295MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/29/2024)
2024-02-29MINUTE ORDER: If Plaintiff opposes Defendant's 5 Motion for Extension, the Court ORDERS that Plaintiff shall respond by March 4, 2024. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/29/2024. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 02/29/2024)
2024-02-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/4/2024. (znbn) (Entered: 03/01/2024)
2024-03-046REPLY to opposition to motion re 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond filed by CRAIG R BECKER. (Sheldon, David) (Entered: 03/04/2024)
2024-03-04MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) Defendant's 5 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; and (2) Defendant shall respond to the 1 Complaint by April 2, 2024. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/4/2024. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 03/04/2024)
2024-03-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 4/2/2024. (znbn) (Entered: 03/05/2024)
2024-03-207NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Dimitar Georgiev-Remmel on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY Substituting for attorney Kenneth A. Adebonojo (Georgiev-Remmel, Dimitar) (Entered: 03/20/2024)
2024-04-018ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY.(Georgiev-Remmel, Dimitar) (Entered: 04/01/2024)
2024-04-01VACATED PURSUANT TO THE MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 4/12/2024.....MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by April 15, 2024. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/1/2024. (lcjeb3) Modified on 4/12/2024 (znbn). (Entered: 04/01/2024)
2024-04-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/15/2024. (znbn) (Entered: 04/01/2024)
2024-04-119Joint MOTION to Vacate Order by DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Georgiev-Remmel, Dimitar) (Entered: 04/11/2024)
2024-04-12MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) The Joint 9 Motion to Vacate is GRANTED; (2) The Court's April 1, 2024, Minute Order is VACATED; and (3) The parties shall submit a joint status report by May 3, 2024. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/12/2024. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 04/12/2024)
2024-04-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/3/2024. (znbn) (Entered: 04/12/2024)
2024-05-0310Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Georgiev-Remmel, Dimitar) (Entered: 05/03/2024)
2024-05-06MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 10 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by June 15, 2024. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/6/2024. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 05/06/2024)
2024-05-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2024 (lsj) (Entered: 05/06/2024)
2024-06-1311Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Georgiev-Remmel, Dimitar) (Entered: 06/13/2024)
2024-06-14MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 11 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by August 15, 2024. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/14/2024. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 06/14/2024)
2024-06-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/15/2024. (znbn) (Entered: 06/14/2024)
2024-08-1512Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Georgiev-Remmel, Dimitar) (Entered: 08/15/2024)
2024-08-16MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 12 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by October 3, 2024. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/16/2024. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 08/16/2024)
2024-08-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/3/2024. (znbn) (Entered: 08/16/2024)
2024-10-0313Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Georgiev-Remmel, Dimitar) (Entered: 10/03/2024)
2024-10-04MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 13 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a proposed joint briefing schedule by October 30, 2024. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on October 4, 2024. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 10/04/2024)
2024-10-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/30/2024. (znbn) (Entered: 10/04/2024)
2024-10-3014PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Georgiev-Remmel, Dimitar) (Entered: 10/30/2024)
2024-10-30MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 14 Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule and ORDERS that: (1) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by January 23, 2025; (2) Plaintiff shall file his cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion by February 27, 2025; (3) Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion and opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion by March 27, 2025; and (4) Plaintiff shall file his reply in support of his cross-motion by April 17, 2025. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on October 30, 2024. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 10/30/2024)
2024-10-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 1/23/2025. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/27/2025. Cross Motions due by 2/27/2025. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/27/2025. Response to Cross Motions due by 3/27/2025. Reply to Cross Motions due by 4/17/2025. (znbn) (Entered: 10/30/2024)
2025-01-1615Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Order,, by DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Georgiev-Remmel, Dimitar) (Entered: 01/16/2025)
2025-01-16MINUTE ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Joint 15 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Order and ORDERS that: (1) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by February 6, 2025; (2) Plaintiff shall file his cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion by March 13, 2025; (3) Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion and opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion by March 27, 2025; and (4) Plaintiff shall file his reply in support of his cross-motion by April 17, 2025. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on January 16, 2024. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 01/16/2025)
2025-02-0616MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit)(Georgiev-Remmel, Dimitar) (Entered: 02/06/2025)
2025-03-0417Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by CRAIG R BECKER. (Sheldon, David) (Entered: 03/04/2025)
2025-03-04MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) The Joint 17 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; (2) Plaintiff shall file his Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by April 14, 2025; 3) Defendant shall file its Opposition and Reply by May 15, 2025; and Plaintiff shall file his Reply by June 13, 2025. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on March 4, 2025. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 03/04/2025)
2025-04-1418Memorandum in opposition to motion re 16 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CRAIG R BECKER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Sheldon, David) Modified event title on 4/15/2025 (znmw). (Entered: 04/14/2025)
2025-05-0919Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to complete briefing by DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Georgiev-Remmel, Dimitar) (Entered: 05/09/2025)
2025-05-12MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) The Joint 19 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; (2) Defendant shall file its Opposition and Reply by June 6, 2025; and Plaintiff shall file his Reply by August 5, 2025. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on May 12, 2025. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 05/12/2025)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar