Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-20 | 1 | COMPLAINT against ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6011657) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet, # 13 Summons for USAO, # 14 Summons for AG, # 15 Summons for DOJ, # 16 Summons for State, # 17 Summons for HHS, # 18 Summons for ACF, # 19 Summons for DHS, # 20 Summons for ICE, # 21 Summons for USCIS, # 22 Summons for CBP)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-20 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-21 | | Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-21 | 3 | SUMMONS (10) Issued Electronically as to ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-25 | | NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT did not have Court seal. Summons to US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT will be re-issued for 03/25/2019 with Court seal. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/25/2019) |
2019-03-25 | 4 | SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/25/2019) |
2019-03-26 | 5 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katherine M. Anthony, :Firm- American Oversight, :Address- 1030 15th Street NW B-255, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - (202) 897-3918. Fax No. - (202) 871-6523 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6022966. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 03/26/2019) |
2019-03-27 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Katherine Marie Anthony is admitted to represent Plaintiff American Oversight pro hac vice in this case. The Court notes, however, that once Ms. Anthony is admitted to the District of Columbia Bar, she must promptly apply for admission to this Court's bar, and she may no longer assume that her motions for leave to appear pro hac vice before this Court will be granted. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 27, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 03/27/2019) |
2019-04-02 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 04/02/2019) |
2019-04-10 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/22/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/21/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/1/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES served on 3/29/2019; U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 3/29/2019; U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 3/29/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/29/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/29/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/1/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 4/1/2019; U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 3/29/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Clay M. Goode)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 04/10/2019) |
2019-04-19 | 8 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 04/19/2019) |
2019-04-22 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall answer the complaint on or before May 6, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 22, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 04/22/2019) |
2019-04-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/6/2019. (tj) (Entered: 04/23/2019) |
2019-05-06 | 9 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT Substituting for attorney Johnny Walker (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 05/06/2019) |
2019-05-06 | 10 | ANSWER to Complaint by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 05/06/2019) |
2019-05-07 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule by May 21, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05-07-2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 05/07/2019) |
2019-05-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 5/21/2019 (tj) (Entered: 05/07/2019) |
2019-05-21 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 05/21/2019) |
2019-05-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before July 1, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on May 21, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 05/21/2019) |
2019-05-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/1/2019. (tj) (Entered: 05/22/2019) |
2019-06-26 | | Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Rudolph Contreras is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 06/26/2019) |
2019-07-01 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 07/01/2019) |
2019-07-31 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 07/31/2019) |
2019-08-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report by September 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 2, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 08/02/2019) |
2019-08-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Additional Joint Status Report due by 9/30/2019. (mac) (Entered: 08/02/2019) |
2019-09-30 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 09/30/2019) |
2019-10-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by October 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 2, 2019. (lccjn2) (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-10-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/30/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 10/03/2019) |
2019-10-30 | 15 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 10/30/2019) |
2019-11-01 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 11/01/2019) |
2019-11-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by December 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 5, 2019. (lccjn2) (Entered: 11/05/2019) |
2019-11-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/5/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 11/05/2019) |
2019-12-05 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 12/05/2019) |
2019-12-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by January 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 10, 2019. (lccjn2) (Entered: 12/10/2019) |
2019-12-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/9/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 12/11/2019) |
2020-01-09 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 01/09/2020) |
2020-01-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 18 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by February 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 10, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 01/10/2020) |
2020-01-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/27/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 01/15/2020) |
2020-02-27 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 02/27/2020) |
2020-02-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 19 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by March 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 28, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 02/28/2020) |
2020-02-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/26/2020. (mac) (Entered: 02/28/2020) |
2020-03-26 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 03/26/2020) |
2020-03-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 20 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by April 27, 2020 to inform the Court of the status of proceedings as to Defendant Department of State. It is further ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by May 29, 2020 to inform the Court of the status of proceedings as to all other Defendants. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 30, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 03/30/2020) |
2020-03-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint status report due by 4/27/2020. Further joint status report by 5/29/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/01/2020) |
2020-04-27 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/27/2020) |
2020-05-29 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 05/29/2020) |
2020-06-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 22 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by July 29, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 2, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 06/02/2020) |
2020-06-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 7/29/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 06/02/2020) |
2020-07-29 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 07/29/2020) |
2020-07-31 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 23 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file Joint Status Reports by August 26, 2020 and September 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 31, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 07/31/2020) |
2020-07-31 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Reports due by 8/26/2020 and 9/30/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 07/31/2020) |
2020-08-26 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 08/26/2020) |
2020-09-30 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (Plaintiff), # 2 Text of Proposed Order (Defendants))(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 09/30/2020) |
2020-10-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 25 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Reports by October 28, 2020. It is further ORDERED that the U.S. Department of State shall meet and confer with Plaintiff by October 16, 2020 to discuss when the State Department will resume processing of Plaintiff's request. It is further ORDERED that the Joint Status Report filed by October 28, 2020 shall include Plaintiff's and State Department's respective positions on when processing should resume. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 2, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 10/02/2020) |
2020-10-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/28/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 10/02/2020) |
2020-10-28 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 10/28/2020) |
2020-10-29 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 26 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Reports by December 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 29, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 10/29/2020) |
2020-10-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/16/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 10/30/2020) |
2020-12-16 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 12/16/2020) |
2020-12-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 27 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by January 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 17, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 12/17/2020) |
2020-12-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/29/2021. (zkh) (Entered: 12/17/2020) |
2021-01-29 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 01/29/2021) |
2021-02-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 28 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by March 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 2, 2021. (lccjn2) (Entered: 02/02/2021) |
2021-02-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/29/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 02/02/2021) |
2021-03-29 | 29 | NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Alexandra Heiman on behalf of All Defendants (Heiman, Julia) (Entered: 03/29/2021) |
2021-03-29 | 30 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Heiman, Julia) (Entered: 03/29/2021) |
2021-04-07 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 30 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report updating the Court on the status of the Department of Homeland Security's responses to Plaintiff's FOIA requests by April 29, 2021. It is further ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report updating the Court on the status of all Defendants' responses to Plaintiff's FOIA requests by June 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 7, 2021. (lccjn2) (Entered: 04/07/2021) |
2021-04-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/29/2021. Second Joint Status Report due by 6/29/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 04/07/2021) |
2021-04-29 | 31 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 04/29/2021) |
2021-06-25 | 32 | Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- J. Zachery Morris, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8556895. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Zachery Morris, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 06/25/2021) |
2021-06-29 | 33 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 06/29/2021) |
2021-06-30 | 34 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney Sara Kaiser Creighton terminated. (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 06/30/2021) |
2021-06-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's 32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of J. Zachery Morris, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that J. Zachery Morris is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice . Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 30, 2021. (lccjn2) (Entered: 06/30/2021) |
2021-07-01 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 33 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by September 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 1, 2021. (lccjn2) (Entered: 07/01/2021) |
2021-07-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/29/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 07/02/2021) |
2021-07-08 | 35 | NOTICE of Appearance by John Zachery Morris on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Morris, John) (Entered: 07/08/2021) |
2021-09-28 | 36 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 09/28/2021) |
2021-09-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. After review of the Parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a further Joint Status Report updating the Court on the status of Defendants' responses to Plaintiff's FOIA requests on or before December 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 30, 2021. (lccjn2) (Entered: 09/30/2021) |
2021-09-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/16/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 10/05/2021) |
2021-12-16 | 37 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 12/16/2021) |
2021-12-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the 37 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the Parties shall file an updated Joint Status Report on or before March 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 22, 2021. (lccjn2) (Entered: 12/22/2021) |
2021-12-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/14/2022. (zcal) (Entered: 12/22/2021) |
2022-03-14 | 38 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 03/14/2022) |
2022-03-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the 38 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the Parties shall file an updated Joint Status Report on or before June 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 17, 2022. (lccjn2) (Entered: 03/17/2022) |
2022-03-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/14/2022. (zcal) (Entered: 03/17/2022) |
2022-06-14 | 39 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 06/14/2022) |
2022-06-21 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of 39 the Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the Parties shall file an updated Joint Status Report on or before September 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 21, 2022. (lccjn2) (Entered: 06/21/2022) |
2022-06-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2022. (zkh) (Entered: 06/22/2022) |
2022-07-14 | 40 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney John Zachery Morris terminated. (Morris, John) (Entered: 07/14/2022) |
2022-09-14 | 41 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 09/14/2022) |
2022-09-26 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 41 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the Parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before December 15, 2022, and every 60 days thereafter until either party moves for a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, files a dispositive motion, or the case is terminated. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 26, 2022. (lccjn2) (Entered: 09/26/2022) |
2022-09-26 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2022. (zcal) (Entered: 09/27/2022) |
2022-10-19 | 42 | Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rachel Baron, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9609797. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel Baron, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 10/19/2022) |
2022-10-25 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's 42 Consent Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachel L. Baron, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(c), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Rachel L. Baron is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 25, 2022. (lccjn2) (Entered: 10/25/2022) |
2022-10-26 | 43 | NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Baron on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Baron, Rachel) (Main Document 43 replaced on 10/27/2022) (zed). (Entered: 10/26/2022) |
2022-12-14 | 44 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 12/14/2022) |
2022-12-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendants' 44 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before December 22, 2022, and every 60 days thereafter until either party moves for a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, files a dispositive motion, or the case is terminated. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 15, 2022. (lccjn2) (Entered: 12/15/2022) |
2022-12-22 | 45 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 12/22/2022) |
2023-02-21 | 46 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-04-24 | 47 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/24/2023) |
2023-06-22 | 48 | NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie Devany on behalf of All Defendants (Devany, Bonnie) (Entered: 06/22/2023) |
2023-06-23 | 49 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Baron, Rachel) (Entered: 06/23/2023) |
2023-08-22 | 50 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Baron, Rachel) (Entered: 08/22/2023) |
2023-10-23 | 51 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 10/23/2023) |
2023-11-16 | 52 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney Rachel Baron terminated. (Baron, Rachel) (Entered: 11/16/2023) |
2023-11-16 | 53 | NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Stoneman on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Stoneman, Taylor) (Main Document 53 replaced on 11/20/2023) (mg). (Entered: 11/16/2023) |
2023-12-22 | 54 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Stoneman, Taylor) (Entered: 12/22/2023) |
2024-02-20 | 55 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Stoneman, Taylor) (Entered: 02/20/2024) |
2024-04-22 | 56 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/22/2024) |
2024-06-20 | 57 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Stoneman, Taylor) (Entered: 06/20/2024) |
2024-07-31 | 58 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 07/31/2024) |
2024-08-08 | 59 | NOTICE of Appearance by Loree Stark on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Stark, Loree) (Entered: 08/08/2024) |
2024-08-09 | 60 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney Taylor Stoneman terminated. (Stoneman, Taylor) (Entered: 08/09/2024) |
2024-08-19 | 61 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 08/19/2024) |
2024-10-18 | 62 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 10/18/2024) |
2024-12-17 | 63 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 12/17/2024) |
2025-01-10 | 64 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Hannah Solomon-Strauss on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Joshua M. Kolsky (Solomon-Strauss, Hannah) (Entered: 01/10/2025) |
2025-02-18 | 65 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Solomon-Strauss, Hannah) (Entered: 02/18/2025) |
2025-04-21 | 66 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Stark, Loree) (Entered: 04/21/2025) |
Hide Docket Events |