Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2018-04-02 | 1 | COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616090307) filed by CHRIS WRIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(td) (Entered: 04/03/2018) |
2018-04-02 | | SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td) (Entered: 04/03/2018) |
2018-04-18 | 2 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 4/4/18, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/4/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/4/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/4/2018.) (td) (Entered: 04/19/2018) |
2018-05-02 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by Denise M. Clark on behalf of All Defendants (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 05/02/2018) |
2018-05-02 | 4 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Clark, Denise) (Entered: 05/02/2018) |
2018-05-03 | 5 | ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of his obligation to follow the FRCP, Local Rules and orders of the court. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: CHRIS WRIGHT, 4020 Washington Boulevard, Suite 301, Arlington, VA 22201. (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/3/18. (DJS) (Entered: 05/03/2018) |
2018-05-03 | | MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference is hereby set for 5/22/18 at 11:15 a.m. in Courtroom 9. No later than 5/18/18 the parties shall file their joint Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting, pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 16.3. The Report shall include a proposed Scheduling Order in the format found on Judge Chutkan's court webpage, along with any proposed changes which shall be highlighted. On the same day that the parties file their Rule 26 report and proposed Scheduling Order, the parties shall also email a Word version of the proposed order to Chambers. When proposing deadlines, the parties shall avoid proposing a schedule that contains submission of simultaneous dispositive cross-motions. In addition to the requirements under the Federal and Local Rules, the parties' report shall contain a succinct summary of the case and the statutory basis for all causes of action and defenses. Counsel who attend the Scheduling Conference must be sufficiently familiar with the case to answer any questions which arise and hold the authority to make stipulations and admissions about all matters that can reasonably be anticipated for discussion. Parties are encouraged to attend, but are not required to do so. Separate Reports will be stricken, sua sponte. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: CHRIS WRIGHT, 4020 Washington Boulevard, Suite 301, Arlington, VA 22201. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/3/18. (DJS) (Entered: 05/03/2018) |
2018-05-04 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 5/22/2018 at 11:15 AM before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (tb) (Entered: 05/04/2018) |
2018-05-18 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Denise) (Entered: 05/18/2018) |
2018-05-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 6 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report and proposed order by August 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/18/18. (DJS) (Entered: 05/18/2018) |
2018-05-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/27/2018. (tb) (Entered: 05/21/2018) |
2018-05-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Scheduling Conference previously set for 5/22/18 at is hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/21/18. (DJS) (Entered: 05/21/2018) |
2018-08-24 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 08/24/2018) |
2018-08-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report it is hereby ordered that the parties shall submit another joint report by January 31, 2019. The report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: CHRIS WRIGHT, 4020 Washington Boulevard, Suite 301, Arlington, VA 22201. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/28/18. (DJS) (Entered: 08/28/2018) |
2018-08-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/31/2019. (tb) (Entered: 08/28/2018) |
2019-01-31 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Denise) (Entered: 01/31/2019) |
2019-02-07 | | MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint status by 5/24/19 and every 60 days thereafter. To the extent the status report contains a briefing schedule, the report shall include a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/7/19. (DJS) (Entered: 02/07/2019) |
2019-02-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/24/2019. (tb) (Entered: 02/08/2019) |
2019-05-24 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 05/24/2019) |
2019-07-23 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 07/23/2019) |
2019-09-25 | 11 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Clark, Denise) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2019: # 1 Exhibit Status Report) (ztd). (Entered: 09/25/2019) |
2019-09-25 | 12 | ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Clark, Denise) Modified on 9/25/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 09/25/2019) |
2019-09-25 | | NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 12 Status Report was entered in error and added as an attachment to 11 pending ruling of motion. (ztd) (Entered: 09/25/2019) |
2019-09-30 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/30/19. (DJS) (Entered: 09/30/2019) |
2019-09-30 | 13 | STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (ztd) (Entered: 10/03/2019) |
2019-11-21 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 11/21/2019) |
2019-11-27 | 15 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Michelle D. Jackson on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Denise M. Clark (Jackson, Michelle) (Entered: 11/27/2019) |
2019-11-27 | 16 | NOTICE of Certificate of Service by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION re 15 Substitution of Counsel (Jackson, Michelle) (Entered: 11/27/2019) |
2020-01-21 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Jackson, Michelle) (Entered: 01/21/2020) |
2020-03-20 | 18 | Unopposed MOTION to Stay by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration)(Jackson, Michelle) (Entered: 03/20/2020) |
2020-03-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: Granting Defendant's Unopposed 18 Motion to Stay. This action is hereby stayed pending further order of the court. The parties shall file a joint status report by April 1, 2020 and every 30 days thereafter. To the extent the report contains a proposal for moving forward with this case or a proposed briefing schedule, the report shall include a proposed order. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: CHRIS WRIGHT, 4020 Washington Boulevard, Suite 301, Arlington, VA 22201. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/21/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 03/21/2020) |
2020-04-01 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Jackson, Michelle) (Entered: 04/01/2020) |
2020-04-03 | 20 | Amended STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Declaration)(Jackson, Michelle) (Entered: 04/03/2020) |
2020-04-30 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Hardy)(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 04/30/2020) |
2020-05-18 | 22 | ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kristin Brudy-Everett on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION Substituting for attorney Michelle D. Jackson (Brudy-Everett, Kristin) Modified on 5/19/2020 (ztd). (Entered: 05/18/2020) |
2020-05-19 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 22 Substitution of Counsel; emailed to kristin.brudy-everett@usdoj.gov, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Please refile document, 3. Incorrect case number on document. (ztd, ) (Entered: 05/19/2020) |
2020-05-19 | 23 | ERRATA by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Notice of Substitution of Counsel)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 05/19/2020) |
2020-05-29 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 05/29/2020) |
2020-06-30 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 06/30/2020) |
2020-07-30 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 07/30/2020) |
2020-09-30 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Settlement Discussions, # 2 Plaintiff's Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 09/30/2020) |
2020-10-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 27 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet, confer and file a another joint report by 11/13/20. The report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. To the extent the parties remain at an impasse, the accompanying proposed order shall contain a proposed briefing schedule. Plaintiff's motion to compel settlement discussions is hereby DENIED, except that the government shall confer with the Plaintiff well in advance of the status report deadline. The court cannot compel a party to engage in settlement discussions. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to the Plaintiff at this address of record. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/1/2020. (DJS) Modified on 10/1/2020 (DJS). (Entered: 10/01/2020) |
2020-10-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/13/2020. (tb) (Entered: 10/01/2020) |
2020-10-02 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 27 Status Report; emailed to kristin.brudy-everett@usdoj.gov, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Motion should be filed as a separate entry on the docket and the order as an attachment. (ztd, ) (Entered: 10/02/2020) |
2020-10-02 | 28 | MOTION to Compel Settlement Discussion, filed on behalf of Plaintiff by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 10/02/2020) |
2020-10-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: Denying Plaintiff's 28 Motion to Compel Settlement Discussions. See 10/01/2020 Minute Order. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: CHRIS WRIGHT, 4020 Washington Boulevard, Suite 301, Arlington, VA 22201. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/5/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 10/05/2020) |
2020-11-13 | 29 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 11/13/2020) |
2020-12-15 | | MIUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 29 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall adhere to the following deadlines: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due 4/28/21. Plaintiff's Combined Opposition/Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due 6/25/21. Defendant's will Combined Reply/Opposition due 7/30/21. Plaintiff's Reply due 8/13/21. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/15/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 12/15/2020) |
2020-12-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 6/25/2021. Response to Cross Motion due by 7/30/2021. Reply to Cross Motion due by 8/13/2021. Summary Judgment motion due by 4/28/2021. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/25/2021. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/30/2021. (tb) (Entered: 12/15/2020) |
2021-04-23 | 30 | Consent MOTION to Modify the Briefing Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 04/23/2021) |
2021-04-30 | | MINUTE ORDER: Granting Consent 30 Motion to Modify deadlines. Defendant's motion for summary judgment due 5/28/21. Plaintiff's combined cross-motion for summary judgment/opposition due 8/9/21. Defendant's combined opposition/reply due 9/8/21. Plaintiff's reply due 9/22/21. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/30/21. (DJS) (Entered: 04/30/2021) |
2021-05-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 8/9/2021. Response to Cross Motion due by 9/8/2021. Reply to Cross Motion due by 9/22/2021. Summary Judgment motion due by 5/28/2021. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/9/2021. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/8/2021. (tb) (Entered: 05/02/2021) |
2021-05-20 | 31 | NEW Request For Pro Se Electronic Noticing by CHRIS WRIGHT. (ztth) (Entered: 05/21/2021) |
2021-05-25 | 32 | Consent MOTION to Modify the Briefing Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 05/25/2021) |
2021-05-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: Granting Consent 32 Motion to Modify Deadlines. Defendant's motion for summary judgment due 6/11/21. Plaintiff's combined cross-motion for summary judgment/opposition due 8/23/21. Defendant's combined opposition/reply due 9/22/21. Plaintiff's reply due 10/6/21. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/28/21. (DJS) (Entered: 05/28/2021) |
2021-06-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 8/23/2021. Response to Cross Motion due by 9/22/2021. Reply to Cross Motion due by 10/6/2021. Summary Judgment motion due by 6/11/2021. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/23/2021. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/22/2021. (tb) (Entered: 06/02/2021) |
2021-06-11 | 33 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration of Michael G. Seidel (FBI), # 4 Exhibit A-JJ (FBI), # 5 Declaration of Vanessa R. Brinkmann (OIP), # 6 Declaration of Kevin G. Tiernan (NSD), # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 06/11/2021) |
2021-06-28 | 34 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Kristin Brudy-Everett (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/28/2021) |
2021-08-20 | 35 | MOTION to conduct limited discovery in oppositon to defendant's motio for summary judgment re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CHRIS WRIGHT. (ztd) Modified event on 8/27/2021 (znmw). (Entered: 08/23/2021) |
2021-09-20 | 36 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/20/2021) |
2021-10-08 | | MINUTE ORDER: In this FOIA action Defendant filed a motion for summary judgment 33 in which it argued that its searches were reasonable and legally sufficient. In response 35 Plaintiff argued, inter alia, that the searches were not sufficient and he asks for discovery. Defendant now seeks to extend the deadline to file its reply brief so that it may conduct supplemental searches for additional documents and prepare supplemental declarations in support of its motion for summary judgment. In light of these events, the court hereby DENIES Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 33 without prejudice and Plaintiff's Motion to Conduct Limited Discovery 35 without prejudice. The parties shall meet, confer and file a joint status report that includes a schedule for filing renewed briefs that take into account the subsequent search activity and additional declarations. The joint status report shall be filed by 10/22/21 and shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Defendant's Motion 36 for an Extension of Time to File its Reply is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/8/21. (DJS) (Entered: 10/08/2021) |
2021-10-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/22/2021. (tb) (Entered: 10/13/2021) |
2021-10-22 | 37 | Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 10/22/2021) |
2021-10-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall adhere to the following deadlines: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due 3/25/22. Plaintiff's Combined Opposition/Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due 6/10/22. Defendant's Combined Reply/Opposition due 7/15/22. Plaintiff's Reply due 7/29/22. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/22/21. (DJS) (Entered: 10/22/2021) |
2021-10-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 6/10/2022. Response to Cross Motions due by 7/15/2022. Reply to Cross Motions due by 7/29/2022. Summary Judgment motions due by 3/25/2022. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/10/2022. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/15/2022. (zjch, ) (Entered: 10/23/2021) |
2021-11-10 | 38 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION Substituting for attorney Johnny H. Walker, III (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/10/2021) |
2022-02-15 | 39 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motions by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 02/15/2022) |
2022-02-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Granting Consent 39 Motion to Extend Deadlines: Defendant's renewed motion for summary judgment due May 27, 2022. Plaintiff's combined opposition/cross-motion due August 12, 2022. Defendant's combined opposition/reply due September 16, 2022. Plaintiff's reply due September 30, 2022. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/17/22. (DJS) (Entered: 02/17/2022) |
2022-02-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 8/12/2022. Response to Cross Motion due by 9/16/2022. Reply to Cross Motion due by 9/30/2022. Summary Judgment motion due by 5/27/2022. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/12/2022. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/16/2022. (tb) (Entered: 02/23/2022) |
2022-05-18 | 40 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motions by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 05/18/2022) |
2022-05-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: Granting 40 Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule. Defendant's renewed motion for summary judgment due June 17, 2022. Plaintiff's combined opposition/cross-motion due September 2, 2022. Defendant's combined opposition/reply due October 7, 2022. Plaintiff's reply due October 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/18/22. (DJS) (Entered: 05/18/2022) |
2022-05-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 9/2/2022. Response to Cross Motion due by 10/7/2022. Reply to Cross Motion due by 10/21/2022. Summary Judgment motion due by 6/17/2022. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/2/2022. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/7/2022. (tb) (Entered: 05/18/2022) |
2022-06-17 | 41 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit - Index of Exhibits and Declarations, # 4 Declaration of Seidel for FBI, with Exhibits 1-3, # 5 Declaration of Brinkmann for Office of Information Policy, with Exhibits A-B, # 6 Declaration of Bennett for Department of Defense, # 7 Declaration of Plante for the Department of Justice's Justice Management Division, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 06/17/2022) |
2022-09-02 | 42 | MOTION for Discovery by CHRIS WRIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw) (Entered: 09/06/2022) |
2022-09-14 | 43 | ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of his obligations under the FRCP, Local Rules, and orders of this court in responding to Defendants 41 Motion for Summary Judgment , and allowing Plaintiff to refile his opposition or other response to that Motion no later than October 5th, 2022. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at his address of record: 4020 Washington Boulevard, Suite 301, Arlington, VA 22201. See Order for further details. Signed by Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/14/2022. (lcss) (Entered: 09/14/2022) |
2022-09-19 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/5/2022. (tb) (Entered: 09/19/2022) |
2022-10-05 | 44 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 10/05/2022) |
2022-10-05 | 46 | Revised MOTION to Conduct Limited Discovery by CHRIS WRIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Statement of Genuine Issues, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Certificate of Service, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(zjm) (Entered: 10/11/2022) |
2022-10-05 | 47 | Memorandum in opposition to re 41 Motion for Summary Judgment,, filed by CHRIS WRIGHT. (See Docket Entry 46 to view document) (zjm) (Entered: 10/11/2022) |
2022-10-06 | 45 | ORDER: Defendant's 44 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time is hereby GRANTED. Defendant's opposition and reply shall be due November 4, 2022. Plaintiff's reply shall be due December 2, 2022. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff at his address of record: Chris Wright, 4020 Washington Boulevard, Suite 301, Arlington, VA 22201. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/6/22. (lcss) (Entered: 10/06/2022) |
2022-10-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Cross Motions due by 11/4/2022. Reply to Cross Motions due by 12/2/2022. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/4/2022. (tb) (Entered: 10/11/2022) |
2022-11-04 | 48 | Memorandum in opposition to re 46 Motion for Discovery filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/04/2022) |
2022-11-04 | 49 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Duplicate of ECF No. 48 filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/04/2022) |
2022-11-09 | 50 | NOTICE Attaching Third Seidel Declaration by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION re 48 Memorandum in Opposition (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael G. Seidel (Third))(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/09/2022) |
2022-12-02 | 51 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 46 MOTION for Discovery filed by CHRIS WRIGHT. (Attachment: # 1 Declaration of Plaintiff Chris Wright)(zjm) (Entered: 12/06/2022) |
2023-03-22 | 52 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by M. Jared Littman on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Douglas C. Dreier (Littman, M. Jared) (Entered: 03/22/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |