Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMOORE et al v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01027
Date Filed2020-04-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffLOIS MOORE
PlaintiffROBERT MOORE
PlaintiffJANA OREAR
PlaintiffCHRISTIANNE O'MALLEY
PlaintiffMARK SAUTER
Case DescriptionLois Moore, Robert Moore, Jana Orear, Christianne O'Malley, and Mark Sauter submitted 21 FOIA requests to the CIA for records concerning what happened to Harry Moore, a U.S. pilot in the Korean War who was captured by the North Koreans. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency Moore and the others filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Fee Category - Media or Educational, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-201COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7040254) filed by LOIS MOORE, ROBERT MOORE, CHRISTIANNE O'MALLEY, JANA OREAR, MARK SAUTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons CIA, # 3 Summons DC USA, # 4 Summons Attorney General)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 04/20/2020)
2020-04-212NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by LOIS MOORE, ROBERT MOORE, CHRISTIANNE O'MALLEY, JANA OREAR, MARK SAUTER. (Clarke, John) Modified on 4/28/2020 to correct docket entry text (zsb). (Entered: 04/21/2020)
2020-04-273ERRATA Complaint Signature Page by LOIS MOORE, ROBERT MOORE, CHRISTIANNE O'MALLEY, JANA OREAR, MARK SAUTER. (Clarke, John) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-04-28Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-04-284SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-06-035NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell C. Valdez on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 06/03/2020)
2020-06-036ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY.(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 06/03/2020)
2020-06-107VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER 11 .....ORDER directing the Government to produce a Vaughn Index by July 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/10/2020. (lcmb) Modified on 7/9/2020 (lsj). (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-06-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Vaughn Index due by 7/10/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-07-028MOTION to Vacate 7 Order for Vaughn Index and Dispositive Motinos by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-069RESPONSE re 8 MOTION to Vacate 7 Order for Vaughn Index and Dispositive Motinos filed by LOIS MOORE, ROBERT MOORE, CHRISTIANNE O'MALLEY, JANA OREAR, MARK SAUTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-0910REPLY to opposition to motion re 8 MOTION to Vacate 7 Order for Vaughn Index and Dispositive Motinos filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-0911ORDER granting 8 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/9/2020. (lcrcl1) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-08-2512STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-08-25MINUTE ORDER Status Report due by 10/26/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 08/25/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-10-2613STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-10-27MINUTE ORDER: Status Report due by 12/28/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/27/2020. (lcrcl3) Modified on 11/4/2020 (zlsj). (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-11-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/28/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-12-2414STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 12/24/2020)
2021-01-2715STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-01-28MINUTE ORDER: Status Report due by 3/5/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/28/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
2021-03-0516STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 03/05/2021)
2021-03-11MINUTE ORDER: Status Report due by 5/5/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/11/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-05-0517STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 05/05/2021)
2021-05-06MINUTE ORDER: Status Report due by 6/30/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/6/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 05/06/2021)
2021-06-3018STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-07-02MINUTE ORDER: Status Report due by 8/30/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/2/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 07/02/2021)
2021-08-3019STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-09-01MINUTE ORDER: Status Report due by 10/15/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/01/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-10-1520STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-12-1021MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A - I, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 12/10/2021)
2021-12-2922ERRATA - Vaughn Index by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Vaughn Index)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 12/29/2021)
2021-12-2923Joint MOTION to Modify Dispositive Motion Schedule by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 12/29/2021)
2022-01-0424ORDER granting 23 Motion to Modify. Plaintiff's Opposition/Cross-Motion Summary Judgment motions due by 1/17/2022. Response/Cross-Opposition due by 2/7/2022. Reply due by 2/28/2022.. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/04/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 01/04/2022)
2022-01-1725Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by ROBERT MOORE, CHRISTIANNE O'MALLEY, JANA OREAR, MARK SAUTER. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Bob Smith Aff., # 2 Affidavit Mark Sauter Aff., # 3 Affidavit Bob Moore Aff., # 4 Affidavit Bethany Hendershot Aff., # 5 Exhibit Hendershot Aff. Ex. A, # 6 Exhibit Hendershot Aff. Ex. B, # 7 Exhibit Hendershot Aff. Ex. C, # 8 Exhibit Hendershot Aff. Ex. D, # 9 Statement of Facts, # 10 Exhibit Response to Def. Statement of Facts, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 01/17/2022)
2022-01-1726MOTION for Order for In Camera inspection by ROBERT MOORE, CHRISTIANNE O'MALLEY, JANA OREAR, MARK SAUTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 01/17/2022)
2022-01-18NOTICE OF ERROR re 25 Motion for Summary Judgment; emailed to johnhclarke@earthlink.net, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. Please refile document, 3. Same document using the OPPOSITION event (zjf, ) (Entered: 01/18/2022)
2022-01-2127Memorandum in opposition to re 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ROBERT MOORE, CHRISTIANNE O'MALLEY, JANA OREAR, MARK SAUTER. (Attachments: # 1 Errata)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 01/21/2022)
2022-02-0328Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 26 MOTION for Order for In Camera inspection , 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 02/03/2022)
2022-02-0429ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's reply/cross-opposition due by 2/21/2022. Plaintiffs' cross-reply due by 3/14/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/4/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 02/04/2022)
2022-02-1730Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 26 MOTION for Order for In Camera inspection , 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 02/17/2022)
2022-02-2331REPLY to opposition to motion re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration AUSA Valdez Decl., # 2 Exhibit J, # 3 Declaration Blaine Supp. Decl.)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 02/23/2022)
2022-02-2332Memorandum in opposition to re 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration AUSA Valdez Decl., # 3 Exhibit J, # 4 Declaration Blaine Supp. Decl., # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 02/23/2022)
2022-02-2333Memorandum in opposition to re 26 MOTION for Order for In Camera inspection filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Blaine Supp. Decl., # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 02/23/2022)
2022-02-2434ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant CIA's reply/cross-opposition due by 2/23/2022. Plaintiff's cross-reply due by 3/16/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/24/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 02/24/2022)
2022-03-1635Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by ROBERT MOORE, CHRISTIANNE O'MALLEY, JANA OREAR, MARK SAUTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 03/16/2022)
2022-03-2236ORDER granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply. Plaintiffs' Reply due by 3/30/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/21/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-3037Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by ROBERT MOORE, CHRISTIANNE O'MALLEY, JANA OREAR, MARK SAUTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 03/30/2022)
2022-04-1238REPLY to opposition re 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ROBERT MOORE, CHRISTIANNE O'MALLEY, JANA OREAR, MARK SAUTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Clarke Aff.)(Clarke, John) Modified on 4/12/2022 to add docket link (zjf). (Entered: 04/12/2022)
2022-04-2539ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/25/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 04/25/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar