Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2020-06-25 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7269685) filed by JOHN ZIMMERLEE, JANA OREAR, THE POW INVESTIGATIVE PROJECT, INC., ROBERT MOORE, LOIS MOORE, CHRISTIANNE O'MALLEY, MARK SAUTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USA, # 3 Summons USA+DC, # 4 Summons NARA)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 06/25/2020) |
2020-06-25 | 2 | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by LOIS MOORE, ROBERT MOORE, CHRISTIANNE O'MALLEY, JANA OREAR, POW INVESTIGATIVE PROJECT, INC., MARK SAUTER, JOHN ZIMMERLEE. Case related to Case No. 20-cv-1027. (zmc) (Entered: 06/26/2020) |
2020-06-26 | | Case assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zmc) (Entered: 06/26/2020) |
2020-06-26 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 06/26/2020) |
2020-08-31 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 08/31/2020) |
2020-09-14 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION.(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 09/14/2020) |
2020-09-15 | 6 | SCHEDULING ORDER: The government shall file a Vaughn Index and supporting dispositive motion by 10/15/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/15/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 09/15/2020) |
2020-10-08 | 7 | Unopposed MOTION to Vacate 6 Scheduling Order by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 10/08/2020) |
2020-10-09 | 8 | ORDER granting 7 Motion to Vacate Scheduling Order; Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/07/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/09/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 10/09/2020) |
2020-12-07 | 9 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by LOIS MOORE, ROBERT MOORE, CHRISTIANNE O'MALLEY, JANA OREAR, POW INVESTIGATIVE PROJECT, INC., MARK SAUTER, JOHN ZIMMERLEE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 12/07/2020) |
2020-12-09 | 10 | ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report; Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/21/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/9/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 12/09/2020) |
2020-12-18 | 11 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Thomas Duffey on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Katherine Palmer-Ball (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 12/18/2020) |
2020-12-18 | 12 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by LOIS MOORE, ROBERT MOORE, CHRISTIANNE O'MALLEY, JANA OREAR, POW INVESTIGATIVE PROJECT, INC., MARK SAUTER, JOHN ZIMMERLEE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 12/18/2020) |
2020-12-21 | 13 | ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time; Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/21/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/21/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 12/21/2020) |
2021-01-21 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2021) |
2021-01-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 2/22/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/21/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 01/21/2021) |
2021-02-22 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 02/22/2021) |
2021-02-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 3/22/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/24/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 02/24/2021) |
2021-03-22 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 03/22/2021) |
2021-03-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 4/22/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/23/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 03/23/2021) |
2021-04-22 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 04/22/2021) |
2021-04-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 5/21/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/23/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 04/23/2021) |
2021-04-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/21/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 04/26/2021) |
2021-05-21 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 05/21/2021) |
2021-05-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 7/21/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/26/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 05/26/2021) |
2021-05-26 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/21/2021. (nbn) (Entered: 05/28/2021) |
2021-07-21 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by LOIS MOORE, ROBERT MOORE, CHRISTIANNE O'MALLEY, JANA OREAR, POW INVESTIGATIVE PROJECT, INC., MARK SAUTER, JOHN ZIMMERLEE. (Clarke, John) (Entered: 07/21/2021) |
2021-07-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 9/1/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/23/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 07/23/2021) |
2021-09-01 | 20 | AMENDED COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION filed by JOHN ZIMMERLEE, JANA OREAR, POW INVESTIGATIVE PROJECT, INC., ROBERT MOORE, CHRISTIANNE O'MALLEY, MARK SAUTER, Eugene McDaniel, CAROL HRDLICKA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 09/01/2021) |
2021-09-01 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 09/01/2021) |
2021-09-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 10/15/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/02/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 09/02/2021) |
2021-09-15 | 22 | ANSWER to 20 Amended Complaint, by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION.(Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 09/15/2021) |
2021-09-23 | 23 | ORDER: Vaughn Index and supporting dispositive motion due by 10/23/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/23/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 09/23/2021) |
2021-09-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Vaughn Index due by 10/23/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 09/24/2021) |
2021-10-15 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 10/15/2021) |
2021-11-15 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 11/15/2021) |
2021-12-08 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 1/15/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/08/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 12/08/2021) |
2022-01-14 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 01/14/2022) |
2022-01-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 3/18/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/24/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 01/24/2022) |
2022-03-18 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 03/18/2022) |
2022-04-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 5/18/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/25/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 04/25/2022) |
2022-05-18 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 05/18/2022) |
2022-05-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 7/19/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/27/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 05/27/2022) |
2022-07-19 | 29 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 07/19/2022) |
2022-07-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 9/20/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/22/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 07/22/2022) |
2022-09-20 | 30 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 09/20/2022) |
2022-09-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by 11/18/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/21/2022 (lcrcl3) (Entered: 09/21/2022) |
2022-11-18 | 31 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 11/18/2022) |
2022-11-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report by 02/17/2023. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/22/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 11/22/2022) |
2023-02-17 | 32 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 02/17/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |