Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBonner v. Federal Bureau Of Investigation et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2021cv02166
Date Filed2021-03-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Paul A. Engelmayer
PlaintiffRaymond Bonner
Case DescriptionJournalist Raymond Bonner submitted FOIA requests to the FBI and the CIA for records concerning Abu Zubaydah. Bonner requested expedited processing in his requests to both agencies. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but denied the request for expedited processing. Bonner filed administrative appeals of the denials from agencies. Bonner then filed suit against both agencies.
Complaint issues: Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau Of Investigation
DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Opinion/Order [19]
Opinion/Order [24]
Opinion/Order [40]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-121COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24242398)Document filed by Raymond Bonner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Dec 4 FBI FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Dec 4 FBI Denial of Expedited Processing, # 3 Exhibit Dec 4 FBI Admin Appeal, # 4 Exhibit Dec 4 FBI Admin Appeal Denial, # 5 Exhibit Jan 30 FBI FOIA Request, # 6 Exhibit CIA FOIA Request, # 7 Exhibit CIA Denial of Expedited Processing, # 8 Exhibit CIA Admin Appeal, # 9 Exhibit CIA Admin Appeal Denial).(Schulz, David) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-03-122REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, re: 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Raymond Bonner..(Schulz, David) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-03-123REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Raymond Bonner..(Schulz, David) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-03-124CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schulz, David) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-03-125STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-cv-9378 (VEC). Document filed by Raymond Bonner..(Schulz, David) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-03-126STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-cv-9378 (VEC). Document filed by Raymond Bonner..(Schulz, David) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-03-15CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(jgo) (Entered: 03/15/2021)
2021-03-15Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (jgo) (Entered: 03/15/2021)
2021-03-15Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 03/15/2021)
2021-03-157ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Intelligence Agency..(jgo) (Entered: 03/15/2021)
2021-03-158ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(jgo) (Entered: 03/15/2021)
2021-03-189COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau Of Investigation. Document filed by Raymond Bonner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Dec 4 FOIA FBI FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Denial of Exp Processing of Dec 4 Request, # 3 Exhibit Admin Appeal of Exp Processing Denial, # 4 Exhibit Denial of Admin Appeal, # 5 Exhibit Jan 30 FBI FOIA Request, # 6 Exhibit Jan 30 CIA FOIA Request, # 7 Exhibit Denial of Exp Processing on Jan 30 CIA Request, # 8 Exhibit Admin Appeal of CIA Exp Processing Denial, # 9 Exhibit Denial of Admin Appeal of CIA Exp Processing Denial).(Schulz, David) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-3110AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Federal Bureau Of Investigation served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Raymond Bonner..(Schulz, David) (Entered: 03/31/2021)
2021-03-3111AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Central Intelligence Agency served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Raymond Bonner..(Schulz, David) (Entered: 03/31/2021)
2021-04-1912NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Kendrick Connolly on behalf of Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 04/19/2021)
2021-04-1913ANSWER to 9 Complaint,, 1 Complaint,,., ANSWER to 9 Complaint,, 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 04/19/2021)
2021-04-2014NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: An initial pretrial conference is hereby scheduled for May 14, 2021 at 2 p.m. This conference will be held telephonically. The parties should call into the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749, and enter Access Code 468-4906, followed by the pound (#) key. Counsel are directed to review the Court's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19, found at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-paul-engelmayer, for the Court's procedures for telephonic conferences and for instructions for communicating with chambers. Initial Conference set for 5/14/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/20/2021) (nb) (Entered: 04/20/2021)
2021-04-2215NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Sheive Normand on behalf of Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
2021-05-1016PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT in advance of the initial conference . Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 05/10/2021)
2021-06-1517STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 06/15/2021)
2021-06-1618MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 17 Status Report filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation, Central Intelligence Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court thanks counsel for this update and encourages the parties to continue to work collegially to resolve the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/16/2021) (va) (Entered: 06/16/2021)
2021-07-3019ORDER: On June 15, 2021, the parties filed a joint status update informing the Court that they were on track to complete processing of the English portions of the handwritten notebook by June 30, 2021. The parties are directed, within one week of the date of this order, to file a joint status update explaining whether processing of the notebook is complete and whether the parties anticipate settlement. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/30/2021) (js) (Entered: 07/30/2021)
2021-08-0620STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 08/06/2021)
2021-08-2421MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 20 Status Report filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation, Central Intelligence Agency. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/24/2021) (tg) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-10-0522STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 10/05/2021)
2021-10-0623MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 22 Status Report filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation, Central Intelligence Agency. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/6/2021) (va) (Entered: 10/06/2021)
2021-11-03***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 24 ORDER & OPINION. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (rro) (Entered: 11/08/2021)
2021-11-0525STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 11/05/2021)
2021-11-0826MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 25 Status Report filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation, Central Intelligence Agency. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/8/2021) (tg) (Entered: 11/08/2021)
2021-12-1727STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 12/17/2021)
2021-12-2028MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 27 Status Report filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation, Central Intelligence Agency. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/20/2021) (va) (Entered: 12/20/2021)
2022-02-0329STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 02/03/2022)
2022-02-0330MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 29 Status Report filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation, Central Intelligence Agency. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/3/2022) (ks) (Entered: 02/03/2022)
2022-03-2231STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-2332MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 31 Status Report filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation, Central Intelligence Agency. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/23/2022) (ate) (Entered: 03/23/2022)
2022-06-0733STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 06/07/2022)
2022-06-0834MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 33 Status Report filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation, Central Intelligence Agency. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The Court thanks counsel for this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/8/2022) (jca) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-08-0835STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 08/08/2022)
2022-08-0936MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 35 Status Report filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation, Central Intelligence Agency ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/9/2022) (ks) (Entered: 08/09/2022)
2022-09-2237STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-09-2338MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 37 Status Report filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation, Central Intelligence Agency. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Cross Motions due by 2/10/2023., Motions due by 12/9/2022., Responses due by 3/10/2023, Replies due by 3/31/2023.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/23/2022) (jca) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-12-0739LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File defendants' motion for summary judgment and supporting papers addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from AUSA Christopher Connolly dated December 7, 2022. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
2022-12-0740ORDER granting 39 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/7/2022) (tg) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
2022-12-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 2/23/2023. Motions due by 12/22/2022. Responses due by 2/23/2023 (tg) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
2022-12-2241MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau Of Investigation. Responses due by 2/23/2023.(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 12/22/2022)
2022-12-2242DECLARATION of Sarah S. Normand in Support re: 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 12/22/2022)
2022-12-2243DECLARATION of Vanna Blaine in Support re: 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D).(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 12/22/2022)
2022-12-2244DECLARATION of Michael G. Seidel in Support re: 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-I).(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 12/22/2022)
2022-12-2245MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 12/22/2022)
2023-01-1146NOTICE of lodging of classified document. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 01/11/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar