Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDAHLSTROM et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01165
Date Filed2022-04-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffJULIE ANN DAHLSTROM
PlaintiffHEBA GOWAYED
Case DescriptionJulie Ann Dahlstrom and Heba Gowayed, professors at Boston University, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning how U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services administered the T-Visa program. Dahlstrom and Gowayed also requested expedited processing. The agency initially denied their request for expedited processing but later reversed its earlier decision and granted the request for expedited processing. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Dahlstrom and Gowayed filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-271COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9198792) filed by JULIE ANN DAHLSTROM, HEBA GOWAYED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit A, # 8 Exhibit B, # 9 Exhibit C, # 10 Exhibit D, # 11 Exhibit E, # 12 Exhibit F, # 13 Exhibit G, # 14 Exhibit H, # 15 Summons)(Hamlin, Christopher) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-04-29NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to chamlin@mhlawyers.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zmh, ) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-292ERRATA - Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by JULIE ANN DAHLSTROM, HEBA GOWAYED re 1 Complaint, filed by JULIE ANN DAHLSTROM, HEBA GOWAYED. (Hamlin, Christopher) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-293REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE upon Merrick B. Garland, US Department of Justice and Matthew M. Graves, US Attorney for District of Columbia re 1 Complaint, filed by JULIE ANN DAHLSTROM, HEBA GOWAYED. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by JULIE ANN DAHLSTROM, HEBA GOWAYED. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Hamlin, Christopher) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-29Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zmh) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-294SUMMONS(3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-05-115MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JULIE ANN DAHLSTROM, HEBA GOWAYED. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction)(Hamlin, Christopher) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-176NOTICE of Proposed Order by JULIE ANN DAHLSTROM, HEBA GOWAYED re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Hamlin, Christopher) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
2022-05-187ERRATA - Exhibit A was inadvertently omitted from the filing of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by JULIE ANN DAHLSTROM, HEBA GOWAYED re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JULIE ANN DAHLSTROM, HEBA GOWAYED. (Hamlin, Christopher) (Entered: 05/18/2022)
2022-05-208CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JULIE ANN DAHLSTROM, HEBA GOWAYED re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hamlin, Christopher) (Entered: 05/20/2022)
2022-05-249MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas L. Hamlin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9259093. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JULIE ANN DAHLSTROM, HEBA GOWAYED. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas L. Hamlin Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Hamlin, Christopher) (Entered: 05/24/2022)
2022-05-24MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Thomas L Hamlin is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on May 24, 2022. (lcjmc1) (Entered: 05/24/2022)
2022-05-24NOTICE OF ERROR re 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; emailed to chamlin@mhlawyers.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following deficiency and file/refile document as instructed , 2. Declaration must have an original, ink signature; refile using the event Declaration (zjf, ) (Entered: 05/24/2022)
2022-05-2510DECLARATION of Thomas L. Hamlin in Support of Motion for Admission of Thomas L. Hamlin Pro Hac Vice Pursuant to LCvR 83.2(d) by JULIE ANN DAHLSTROM, HEBA GOWAYED re Notice of QC,. (Hamlin, Christopher) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-2611NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda A. Gonzalez Horowitz on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-2612ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Leave to Appear of Thomas L. Hamlin as counsel on behalf of Plaintiff's Julie Ann Dahlstrom and Heba Gowayed by JULIE ANN DAHLSTROM, HEBA GOWAYED. (Hamlin, Christopher) Modified on 5/26/2022 (zjf). (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-26NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear of Thomas L. Hamlin as counsel on behalf of Plaintiff's Julie Ann Dahlstrom and Heba Gowayed . The following error(s) need correction: Invalid attorney signature- signature on document must match PACER login. Please refile using assigned login/password for Thomas L. Hamlin. (zjf) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-2613Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-2714NOTICE of Appearance by Tom Hamlin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hamlin, Tom) (Entered: 05/27/2022)
2022-05-31MINUTE ORDER granting 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME: Having considered the motion and for good cause shown, the Court grants the motion. Defendant shall file its response to 5 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by June 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on May 31, 2022. (lcjmc1) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-06-0115MOTION for Hearing re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JULIE ANN DAHLSTROM, HEBA GOWAYED. (Hamlin, Christopher) (Entered: 06/01/2022)
2022-06-0216RESPONSE re 15 MOTION for Hearing re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
2022-06-0317REPLY re 15 MOTION for Hearing re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JULIE ANN DAHLSTROM, HEBA GOWAYED. (Hamlin, Christopher) Modified on 6/6/2022 to correct docket link (zjm). (Entered: 06/03/2022)
2022-06-0318Memorandum in opposition to re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cynthia Munita)(Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 06/03/2022)
2022-06-0619ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 06/06/2022)
2022-06-0720MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JULIE ANN DAHLSTROM, HEBA GOWAYED. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hamlin, Christopher) (Entered: 06/07/2022)
2022-06-0821MEMORANDUM re 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JULIE ANN DAHLSTROM, HEBA GOWAYED by JULIE ANN DAHLSTROM, HEBA GOWAYED. (Hamlin, Christopher) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar