Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDERNESS WORKSHOP v. U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01216
Date Filed2022-05-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffWILDERNESS WORKSHOP
Case DescriptionThe Wilderness Workshop submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the Trail Gulch Unit and associated oil and gas leases within the North Fork Mancos Master Development Plan. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency provided four interim releases of records but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Wilderness Workshop filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT an agency of the United States
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-021COMPLAINT against WILDERNESS WORKSHOP ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9208015) filed by WILDERNESS WORKSHOP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Stills, Travis) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-022LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILDERNESS WORKSHOP (Stills, Travis) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-03Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmh) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-05-033SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-05-114NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A Hornbein on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hornbein, Melissa) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar