Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFRIENDS OF THE EARTH et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01518
Date Filed2022-05-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffFRIENDS OF THE EARTH
PlaintiffLUKAS ROSS PROGRAM MANAGER
Case DescriptionFriends of the Earth submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the official actions of State Department Senior Energy Advisor Amos Hochstein in his official capacity. FOE also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FOE filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-311COMPLAINT DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9270625) filed by FRIENDS OF THE EARTH, LUKAS ROSS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, part 1 of 3, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, part 2 of 3, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, part 3 of 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 12 Summons Summons, # 13 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-05-31Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-05-312SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-06-083NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Michael Tepe on behalf of All Defendants (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-094NOTICE of Appearance by William Stewart Eubanks, II on behalf of FRIENDS OF THE EARTH, LUKAS ROSS (Eubanks, William) (Entered: 06/09/2022)
2022-06-295Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-07-066ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or respond on or before 8/19/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/29/2022. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 07/06/2022)
2022-08-177Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 08/17/2022)
2022-09-13MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. It is ORDERED that the defendant shall answer or respond to the Complaint on or before 10/18/2022. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/13/2022. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 09/13/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar