Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleInnovation Law Lab v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictDistrict of New Mexico
CityLas Cruces
Case Number2:2022cv00443
Date Filed2022-06-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales
PlaintiffInnovation Law Lab
Case DescriptionInnovation Law Lab submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the DHS Inspector General Detention of the Torrance County Inspection Facility. Innovation Law Lab also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but did not make a decision on expedited processing or a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Innovation Law Lab filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [9]
Opinion/Order [10]
Opinion/Order [12]
Opinion/Order [17]
Opinion/Order [20]
Opinion/Order [22]
Opinion/Order [23]
Opinion/Order [26]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-131COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Innovation Law Lab. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Sheff, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/13/2022)
2022-06-13Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8315115 re 1 Complaint, filed by Innovation Law Lab (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sheff, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/13/2022)
2022-06-13Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg) (Entered: 06/13/2022)
2022-06-13United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (jg) (Entered: 06/13/2022)
2022-06-132PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 06/13/2022)
2022-06-133Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Innovation Law Lab. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5) (Sheff, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/13/2022)
2022-06-13Summons Issued as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (2), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jg) (Entered: 06/13/2022)
2022-06-144NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed within 10 days . The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh) (Entered: 06/14/2022)
2022-06-245SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovation Law Lab. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Summons Return - DHS General Counsel, # 2 Supplement Summons Return - ICE Office of Principal Legal Advisor)(Sheff, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/24/2022)
2022-06-246NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 06/24/2022)
2022-06-247RESPONSE in Opposition re 3 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration) (Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 06/24/2022)
2022-06-278PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 06/27/2022)
2022-06-289ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 6/30/2022 at 11:00 AM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah) (Entered: 06/28/2022)
2022-06-2910AMENDED ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales resetting the telephonic status conference for TUESDAY, JULY 5, 2022, at 9:00 a.m. . (tah) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-06-29Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/5/2022 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-07-0511ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. Status Conference set for 7/8/2022 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (mej) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-0512ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (mej) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-0613REPLY to Response to Motion re 3 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Innovation Law Lab. (Sheff, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/06/2022)
2022-07-0614NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Innovation Law Lab re 3 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Innovation Law Lab (Sheff, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/06/2022)
2022-07-0715SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovation Law Lab. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 6/20/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (Sheff, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/07/2022)
2022-07-0816ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. Status Conference set for 7/22/2022 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (mej) (Entered: 07/08/2022)
2022-07-18***FILED IN ERROR***AMENDED ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. Status Conference set for 7/22/2022 at 01:30 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah) Modified text on 7/18/2022 (arn). (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-1817AMENDED ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. Telephonic status conference set 7/22/2022 at 1:30 p.m. (tah) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-1918ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Innovation Law Lab.(Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 07/19/2022)
2022-07-2219Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/22/2022 from 1:30-1:40 p.m. Participants included Christopher Benoit and Rebecca Sheff on behalf of Plaintiff; Manual Lucero on behalf of Defendant. Case is progressing satisfactorily. The Court will schedule a follow up status conference on 8/3/2022 at 2:30 p.m. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Court Reporter Fatima Sanchez) (tah) (Entered: 07/22/2022)
2022-07-2620ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 8/3/2022 at 02:30 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah) (Entered: 07/26/2022)
2022-08-0321Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/3/2022. (Court Reporter Fatima Sanchez) (tah) (Entered: 08/03/2022)
2022-08-0422ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales finding as moot 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (tah) (Entered: 08/04/2022)
2022-08-0423INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Joint Status Report due by September 6, 2022. Initial Scheduling Conference set for September 15, 2022 at 11:00 AM. (atc) (Entered: 08/04/2022)
2022-08-2624Joint Status Report by Innovation Law Lab (Benoit, Christopher) (Entered: 08/26/2022)
2022-09-1525Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea: Scheduling Conference held on 9/15/2022. (atc) (Entered: 09/15/2022)
2022-09-1526SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (atc) (Entered: 09/15/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar