Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKINSELLA v. BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02147
Date Filed2022-07-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffSIMON V. KINSELLA
Case DescriptionSimon Kinsella filed suit against the Bureau of Ocean Energy Management over the building of an off-shore wind facility. This is not a FOIA request.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantBUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT
DefendantDEB HAALAND Secretary of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Interior
DefendantMICHAEL S. REGAN Administrator, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-201COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND, MICHAEL S. REGAN ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 202631) filed by SIMON V. KINSELLA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Appendix 1, # 3 Appendix 2, # 4 Appendix 3, # 5 Appendix 4, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(zjm) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-07-202MOTION for CM/ECF User Name and Password by SIMON V. KINSELLA. (zjm) (Entered: 07/25/2022)
2022-07-21Summons (3) Issued as to BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND, MICHAEL S. REGAN. (zjm) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-07-21SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zjm) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-07-25MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Motion for CM/ECF Username and Password: Plaintiff Simon V. Kinsella moves the Court for leave to obtain a username and password for the Court's Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system. This Motion, ECF 2, is GRANTED. Under the local rules, a pro se party may obtain a CM/ECF username and password from the Clerk of the Court with the Court's permission. LCvR 5.4(b)(2). To obtain leave of the Court, the pro se party must file a written motion entitled "Motion for CM/ECF User Name and Password" that (1) "describ[es] the party's access to the internet"; (2) "confirm[s] [the party's] capacity to file documents and receive filings electronically on a regular basis"; and (3) "certif[ies] that [the party] either has successfully completed the entire Clerk's Office on-line tutorial or has been permitted to file electronically in other federal courts." Id. The Judge presiding over the case wields discretion over granting a motion for a CM/ECF username and password. Id. Kinsella's Motion satisfies the local rules. He attests that he has access to the internet, that he has the capacity to file and receive filings electronically, and that he will complete the entire Clerk's Office online tutorial for CM/ECF filing. ECF 2 at 1-2. Accordingly, Kinsella's motion for a CM/ECF username and password, ECF 2, is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on July 25, 2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 07/25/2022)
2022-07-263NOTICE by SIMON V. KINSELLA re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit E, # 4 Exhibit F-I, # 5 Errata J, # 6 Exhibit K, # 7 Errata L), # 8 Exhibit L, # 9 Exhibit M, # 10 Exhibit N, # 11 Exhibit O, # 12 Exhibit P) "LET THIS BE FILED" Signed by Jia M. Cobb on 07/26/2022(zjf) (Entered: 07/29/2022)
2022-08-154ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/8/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/7/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Service, US AG Garland)(KINSELLA, SIMON) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/15/2022) (zjf). Modified on 8/15/2022 to correct serve/answer due date (zjf). Modified on 9/13/2022 (zjf). (Entered: 08/15/2022)
2022-08-155ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/9/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Service, US Attorney DC, Graves)(KINSELLA, SIMON) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/15/2022) (zjf). Modified on 9/13/2022 (zjf). (Entered: 08/15/2022)
2022-08-166RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEB HAALAND served on 7/26/2022 (KINSELLA, SIMON) (Entered: 08/16/2022)
2022-08-167RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT served on 7/26/2022 (KINSELLA, SIMON) (Entered: 08/16/2022)
2022-08-168RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHAEL S. REGAN served on 8/3/2022 (KINSELLA, SIMON) (Entered: 08/16/2022)
2022-08-169AFFIDAVIT re 3 Notice (Other), 1 Complaint, AFFIDAVIT of JOINDER SERVICE by SIMON V. KINSELLA. (KINSELLA, SIMON) (Entered: 08/16/2022)
2022-09-0810NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Stoner on behalf of BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND, MICHAEL S. REGAN (Stoner, Amanda) (Entered: 09/08/2022)
2022-09-0811MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of New York by BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND, MICHAEL S. REGAN. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - Mahoney Complaint, # 3 Exhibit B - ROD, # 4 Exhibit C - FEIS, # 5 Exhibit D - Excerpt of March 18, 2021 PSC Order Adopting Joint Proposal, # 6 Exhibit E - Order Denying Petitions for Rehearing, # 7 Exhibit F - Consent Motion to Modify Scheduling Order D. Mass, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Stoner, Amanda) (Entered: 09/08/2022)
2022-09-1212WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED ON 09/13/2022.....AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT against BOEM and Dept. of Interior by SIMON V. KINSELLA. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Request to Clerk to Enter Default)(KINSELLA, SIMON) Modified on 9/13/2022 (zed). (Entered: 09/12/2022)
2022-09-1213ERRATA including Exhibit A to Affidavit for Default by SIMON V. KINSELLA re 12 Affidavit for Default. (KINSELLA, SIMON) (Entered: 09/12/2022)
2022-09-1214MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND, MICHAEL S. REGAN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stoner, Amanda) (Entered: 09/12/2022)
2022-09-1215RESPONSE re 12 Affidavit for Default filed by BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND, MICHAEL S. REGAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 09/12/2022)
2022-09-1316NOTICE of Withdrawal of Affidavit of Default in view of new information by SIMON V. KINSELLA re 12 Affidavit for Default, 13 Errata (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Duplicate Federal Express proofs of delivery (with same tracking ref.))(KINSELLA, SIMON) (Entered: 09/13/2022)
2022-09-13NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 5 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General, 4 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney,. The following error(s) need correction: Summons not issued as to the U.S. Attorney or U.S. Attorney General Other- Please refile. (zjf) (Entered: 09/13/2022)
2022-09-1317REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia filed by SIMON V. KINSELLA. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Summons for U.S. Attorney, D.C.)(KINSELLA, SIMON) (Entered: 09/13/2022)
2022-09-13MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer: The Government filed its Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer on September 12, 2022. Although the plaintiff has not yet informed the Court of their position on the matter, having considered the motion and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The time for The Government to file its responsive pleading to the Complaint in this lawsuit is extended to thirty days after: (1) the case is transferred and a new docket number and judge is assigned (should the Motion to Transfer 11 be granted); or (2) this Court issues an order denying the Motion to Transfer (should the Motion be denied). Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on 9/13/2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 09/13/2022)
2022-09-1418SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zed) (Entered: 09/14/2022)
2022-09-2219RESPONSE re 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of New York and Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by SIMON V. KINSELLA. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit: Kinsella, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(KINSELLA, SIMON) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-09-2220Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Expedited Hearing by SIMON V. KINSELLA. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support MEMO in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts Statement of Material Facts, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 4 Affidavit Affidavit: Kinsella, # 5 USCA Order Proposed Order)(KINSELLA, SIMON) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-09-2621Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (correcting ECF # 20) by SIMON V. KINSELLA. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support (corrected), # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Statement of Facts (corrected), # 5 Affidavit Kinsella)(KINSELLA, SIMON) (Entered: 09/26/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar