Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02510
Date Filed2022-08-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted six FOIA requests to the Department of State and the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning the use of the Public Health Act to keep migrants out of the United States. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantCENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-08-221COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9459432) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAO, # 3 Summons US Atty General, # 4 Summons US Dept. of Health & Human Servs., # 5 Summons Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, # 6 Summons US Dept. of State)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 08/22/2022)
2022-08-222LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 08/22/2022)
2022-08-25NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to hart.wood@americanoversight.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) . (Entered: 08/29/2022)
2022-09-02MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause, on or before September 16, why this case should not be dismissed given Plaintiff's failure to remedy the errors that the Clerk's Office has identified with the filing and asked Plaintiff to correct on August 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on 9/2/2022. (lcjmc1) (Entered: 09/02/2022)
2022-09-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 9/16/2022. (lcjr) (Entered: 09/02/2022)
2022-09-073RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 09/07/2022)
2022-09-074CIVIL COVER SHEET by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT re 1 Complaint, filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT.(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 09/07/2022)
2022-09-08Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 09/08/2022)
2022-09-085SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 09/08/2022)
2022-09-086STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 8, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/08/2022)
2022-09-297RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/15/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/15/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/20/22., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION served on 9/20/2022; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES served on 9/19/2022; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 9/20/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 09/29/2022)
2022-10-178ANSWER to Complaint by CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/17/2022)
2022-10-319Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 10/31/2022)
2022-10-31MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by January 17, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 31, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 10/31/2022)
2022-11-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/17/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 11/01/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar