Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-02-12 | 1 | COMPLAINT against United States Department of Energy. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27331404)Document filed by Charles Seife..(Bahr, David) (Entered: 02/12/2023) |
2023-02-12 | 2 | CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bahr, David) (Entered: 02/12/2023) |
2023-02-12 | 3 | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Energy, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Seife..(Bahr, David) (Entered: 02/12/2023) |
2023-02-12 | 4 | MOTION for David A Bahr to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27331414. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Charles Seife. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Dave Bahr in Support of Motion PHV, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Dave Bahr's Motion PHV).(Bahr, David) (Entered: 02/12/2023) |
2023-02-13 | | CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pc) (Entered: 02/13/2023) |
2023-02-13 | | Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 02/13/2023) |
2023-02-13 | | Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 02/13/2023) |
2023-02-13 | | ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Alan Bahr. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted;. (pc) (Entered: 02/13/2023) |
2023-02-13 | | >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 4 MOTION for David A Bahr to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27331414. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz) (Entered: 02/13/2023) |
2023-02-13 | 5 | ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Energy..(pc) (Entered: 02/13/2023) |
2023-02-14 | 6 | ORDER granting 4 Motion for David A Bahr to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz) (Entered: 02/14/2023) |
2023-02-23 | 7 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint served. United States Department of Energy served on 2/21/2023, answer due 3/23/2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Charles Seife..(Bahr, David) (Entered: 02/23/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |