Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleState of Florida et al v. United States Department of Health and Human Services
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2023cv00890
Date Filed2023-03-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge William M. Ray, II
PlaintiffState of Florida
PlaintiffFlorida Agency for Health Care Administration
Case DescriptionThe State of Florida's Agency for Health Care Administration submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning March 2022 guidance concerning the treatment of Gender Dysphoria for Children and Adolescents. AHCA also requested a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged request of the request and granted AHCA's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, AHCA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-03-031COMPLAINT filed by State of Florida and Florida Agency for Health Care Administration. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12426781) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-032PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Florida Agency for Health Care Administration, State of Florida (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Hunter, Gary) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-063Summons Issued as to United States Department of Health and Human Services, US Attorney, US Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(tas) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-064Return of Service Executed by State of Florida, Florida Agency for Health Care Administration. United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 3/6/2023, answer due 4/5/2023. (Hunter, Gary) Modified on 3/7/2023 to correct answer due date for FOIA case (rvb). (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-085Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Andrew T. Sheeran. Clerk to follow-up by 3/20/2023. (kkh) (Entered: 03/08/2023)
2023-03-166NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Pickens on behalf of State of Florida and Florida Agency for Health Care Administration (Pickens, Steven) Modified on 3/16/2023 (bgt). (Entered: 03/16/2023)
2023-03-177APPLICATION for Admission of Mohammad Jazil Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12469293).by State of Florida. (Pickens, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 03/17/2023)
2023-03-178APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew Sheeran Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12469308).by State of Florida. (Pickens, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 03/17/2023)
2023-03-219STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 3/21/2023. (tas) (Entered: 03/21/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar