Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBIDDLE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01380
Date Filed2023-05-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffSAM BIDDLE
Case DescriptionSam Biddle, a journalist, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records pertaining to the Algorithmic Warfare Cross-Functional Team's use of Google technology between January 1, 2017 and March 6, 2018. Biddle also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request, primarily under Exemption 3 (other statutes), claiming the records involved critical infrastructure information. Biddle filed an administrative appeal. The agency provided a second decision on the initial request and denied the records again. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Biddle filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-161COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10071093) filed by SAM BIDDLE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet, # 11 Summons (United States Attorney's Office), # 12 Summons (U.S. Department of Defense), # 13 Summons (United States Attorney General))(Britz, Benjamin) Modified on 5/17/2023 to add filing fee information (zsl). (Entered: 05/16/2023)
2023-05-17Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsl) (Entered: 05/17/2023)
2023-05-172SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 05/17/2023)
2023-05-173MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen A. Fowler, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10075909. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SAM BIDDLE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen A. Fowler, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Certificate of Good Standing))(Britz, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/17/2023)
2023-05-174MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Justin Pendleton, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10075953. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SAM BIDDLE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Justin Pendleton, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Certificate of Good Standing))(Britz, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/17/2023)
2023-05-18MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 3 4 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Stephen A. Fowler and Justin Pendleton are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear on behalf of Plaintiff. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/18/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 05/18/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar