Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-05-19 | 1 | COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT, FOREIGN NATIONS 1-10, HONORABLE LLOYD J AUSTIN III, JANE DOES 1-10, JOHN DOES 1-10, LEGAL ENTITIES 1-10 with Jury Demand, filed by THE ESTATE OF ATTORNEY SIMON M BUENAVENTURA. (Service of Process Deadline 8/17/2023) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 2, # 2 Attachment 3, # 3 Complaint, # 4 Endnote 1, # 5 Addendum A, # 6 Footnote 1, # 7 Footnote 2, # 8 Footnote 3, # 9 Endnote 10, # 10 Endnote 11, # 11 Endnote 14, # 12 Endnote 15, # 13 Endnote 16, # 14 Endnote 23, # 15 Endnote 29, # 16 Endnote 30, # 17 Endnote 99, # 18 Endnote 100, # 19 Endnote 101, # 20 Endnote 13, # 21 Endnote 53, # 22 Endnote 54, # 23 Endnote 55, # 24 Endnote 78, # 25 Endnote 79, # 26 Endnote 80, # 27 Endnote 82, # 28 Endnote 86, # 29 Endnote 87, # 30 Endnote 88, # 31 Endnote 102, # 32 Endnote 103, # 33 Endnote 104, # 34 Endnote 105)(clp) (Entered: 05/19/2023) |
2023-05-19 | 2 | CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1)(clp) (Entered: 05/19/2023) |
2023-05-19 | 3 | MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs by THE ESTATE OF ATTORNEY SIMON M BUENAVENTURA (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 4)(clp) (Entered: 05/19/2023) |
2023-05-19 | 4 | NOTICE: Recently THE ESTATE OF ATTORNEY SIMON M BUENAVENTURA filed a pleading in this Court without representation of an attorney. Information regarding representing yourself is available on the Court's website at https://www.med.uscourts.gov/handout-self-represented-parties including a Handout for Self-Represented Parties. This handout is intended for informational and practical purposes only and in no way takes the place of an attorney's legal advice, but it may provide some answers to procedural and general questions. ALSO NOTE: You are responsible for notifying the Court in writing of any changes to your mailing address or telephone number and of any change in status regarding representation by an attorney. (cc: pro se litigant) (clp) (Entered: 05/19/2023) |
2023-05-22 | 5 | ORDER granting 3 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 05/22/2023) |
2023-06-05 | 6 | REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 1 Complaint. Objections to R&R due by 6/20/2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 06/05/2023) |
2023-06-19 | 7 | MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Recommended Decision by THE ESTATE OF ATTORNEY SIMON M BUENAVENTURA (Attachments: # 1 Email received June 19, 2023 to ECF Inbox)(clp) (Entered: 06/19/2023) |
2023-06-20 | 8 | ORDER granting 7 Motion to Extend Time to File Objection to Recommended Decision. Time is extended to July 11, 2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 06/20/2023) |
2023-06-20 | | Reset Deadlines as to 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 1 Complaint per order no. 8: Objections to R&R due by 7/11/2023 (clp) (Entered: 06/20/2023) |
2023-07-10 | 9 | MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Recommended Decision by THE ESTATE OF ATTORNEY SIMON M BUENAVENTURA (Attachments: # 1 Email Received 7/10/2023 to ECF Inbox)(clp) (Entered: 07/10/2023) |
2023-07-10 | 10 | ORDER denying 9 Motion to Extend Time. The Plaintiff was previously granted a 21-day extension. His second request offers no justification for a second, 21-day extension. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (LEVY, JON) (Entered: 07/10/2023) |
2023-07-10 | 11 | MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Recommended Decision by THE ESTATE OF ATTORNEY SIMON M BUENAVENTURA (Attachments: # 1 Email Received 7/10/2023 to ECF Inbox)(clp) (Entered: 07/11/2023) |
2023-07-11 | 12 | ORDER denying 11 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Recommended Decision By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (clp) (Entered: 07/11/2023) |
2023-07-11 | 13 | Objection to Report and Recommended Decision re 6 Report and Recommended Decision filed by THE ESTATE OF ATTORNEY SIMON M BUENAVENTURA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Endnote 5)(slg) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-08-04 | 14 | ORDER ACCEPTING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE accepting 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 1 Complaint By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (clp) (Entered: 08/04/2023) |
2023-08-04 | 15 | JUDGMENT - By DEPUTY CLERK: Charity Pelletier. (clp) (Entered: 08/04/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |