Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRolling Stone, LLC v. Department of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2023cv10741
Date Filed2023-12-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lewis J. Liman
PlaintiffRolling Stone, LLC
Case DescriptionRolling Stone submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning Henry Kissinger. Rolling Stone also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Rolling Stone filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDepartment of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-12-101COMPLAINT against Department of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-28673373)Document filed by Rolling Stone, LLC..(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/10/2023)
2023-12-102CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/10/2023)
2023-12-103RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Penske Media Corporation for Rolling Stone, LLC. Document filed by Rolling Stone, LLC..(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/10/2023)
2023-12-104FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, US Attorney General, US Attorney for the Southern District of New York, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Rolling Stone, LLC..(McClanahan, Kelly) Modified on 12/11/2023 (vf). (Entered: 12/10/2023)
2023-12-11CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(vf) (Entered: 12/11/2023)
2023-12-11Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (vf) (Entered: 12/11/2023)
2023-12-11Case Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 12/11/2023)
2023-12-11***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kelly Brian McClanahan to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Docket Entry Error. Enter the party name as to whom summons is issued for when prompted in ECF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) (Entered: 12/11/2023)
2023-12-115REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Rolling Stone, LLC..(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/11/2023)
2023-12-116REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Rolling Stone, LLC..(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/11/2023)
2023-12-117REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Rolling Stone, LLC..(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/11/2023)
2023-12-128ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Justice..(jgo) (Entered: 12/12/2023)
2023-12-129ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Justice..(jgo) (Entered: 12/12/2023)
2023-12-1210ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Justice..(jgo) (Entered: 12/12/2023)
2023-12-2811SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint served. Department of Justice served on 12/22/2023, answer due 1/22/2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Rolling Stone, LLC..(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/28/2023)
2024-01-1612LETTER MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Kel McClanahan dated 16 January 2024. Document filed by Rolling Stone, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint).(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 01/16/2024)
2024-01-1713ORDER granting 12 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document on the condition that the amended complaint is filed on or before January 19, 2024. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis) (Entered: 01/17/2024)
2024-01-1714NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Danielle Marryshow on behalf of Department of Justice..(Marryshow, Danielle) (Entered: 01/17/2024)
2024-01-1715FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Department of Justice.Document filed by Rolling Stone, LLC. Related document: 1 Complaint..(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 01/17/2024)
2024-01-3116ANSWER to 15 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Department of Justice..(Tarczynska, Dominika) (Entered: 01/31/2024)
2024-02-0517NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on February 20, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. as set forth herein. Counsel for Plaintiff is ordered to notify all counsel of this Notice. SO ORDERED.Telephonic Initial Conference set for 2/20/2024 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/05/2024) (ama) (Entered: 02/05/2024)
2024-02-1318JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Dominika Tarczynska dated 2/13/2024 re: Case Management Plan. Document filed by Department of Justice..(Tarczynska, Dominika) (Entered: 02/13/2024)
2024-02-1419MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 18 Letter Case Management Plan filed by Department of Justice. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are relieved of the obligation to file a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/14/24) (yv) (Entered: 02/14/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar