Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02850
Date Filed2022-09-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionAmerica First Legal Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the political pressures applied by the Biden administration to confirm judges. AFL also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AFL filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-201COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9532833) filed by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 B, # 3 C, # 4 D, # 5 E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons Main Justice, # 8 Summons US Attorney's Office)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-20Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-202SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-20NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to michael.ding@aflegal.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (zsb, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-273STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 27, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/27/2022)
2022-09-274REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION.(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 09/27/2022)
2022-09-275SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zed) (Entered: 09/27/2022)
2022-10-046LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION (Ding, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-11-047RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/11/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/10/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement USPS Tracking)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 11/04/2022)
2022-11-048RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/11/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 11/04/2022)
2022-11-109ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 11/10/2022)
2022-11-10MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before December 1, 2022. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 10, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 11/10/2022)
2022-12-0110Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-02MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before February 10, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 2, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 12/02/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar