Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02991
Date Filed2022-10-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionAmerica First Legal submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning contacts between the agency and Facebook between October and November 2020 related to Hunter Biden's laptop and Russian dis- or misinformation. AFL also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied AFL's request for expedited processing and put it in the general category for fee purposes. The agency then told AFL that it was closing the request because it did not adequate describe the records sought. AFL then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-10-041COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9574303) filed by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons Summons FBI, # 7 Summons Summons DOJ, # 8 Summons Summons USADC)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-10-042LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION (Ding, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-10-04NOTICE OF ERROR re 2 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests; emailed to michael.ding@aflegal.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. No signature. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or '/s/ Attorney Name' to represent an electronic signature of the filer., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, ) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-10-04Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (znmg) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-10-043SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-10-044ERRATA by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION re Notice of QC- New Case,, 2 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests. (Ding, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-11-045RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/11/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 11/04/2022)
2022-11-046RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 10/11/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 11/04/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar